Sneed v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: |
Brenda Lee Sneed |
Defendant: |
Social Security Administration |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00050 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Gerrard |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 0405 Review of HHS Decision |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Commissioner's motion to strike (filing 32 ) is denied as moot. This case is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until August 15, 2013, to complete service of process or to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for her failure to effect service of process. If plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: August 15, 2013: deadline for plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this memorandum and order together wi th three summons forms and three copies of Form 285 to plaintiff for service of process on the United States. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms (see attached Notice for persons to be served) and send the completed summonses and USM-285 forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of those forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed summons forms and USM-285 forms, the Clerk shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed with forms to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?