Nesbitt v. Houston
Petitioner: |
Thomas Edward Nesbitt |
Respondent: |
Robert Houston |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00075 |
Filed: |
March 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Nesbitt's Motion for Recusal (filing no. 7 ) is denied. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 8 ) is granted. Nesbitt's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudi ce to the reassertion of a subsequent petition upon authorization by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Nesbitt's Motion for Hearing (filing no. 10 ), Motion for Records (filing no. 11 ), and Motion for Copies (filing no. 13 ) are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily decides that Petitioners claims are potentially cognizable in federal court; The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum a nd Order and the Petition (Filing No. 1 ) to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail; By June 27, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 26, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/27/2013: deadline for Respondent to file state courtrecords in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?