Tretheway v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Tretheway
Case Number: 8:2013cv00109
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 14 is granted; defendant shall have until January 15, 2014, to respond to plaintiff's brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
January 15, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 16 is granted; defendant shall have until February 14, 2014, to respond to plaintiff's brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 4, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - This matter is before the Court on the appeal of plaintiff, Michael Tretheway ("Tretheway"), of a final decision by the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration ("SSA") denying Tretheway's application for disability benefits. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
June 9, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Paintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,508.67 to be paid by the Social Security Administration. The EAJA fee is payable to plaintiff as the litigant and may be subject to offset to satisfy any pre-existing debt the litigant may owe to the United States. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
August 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 5 is granted; plaintiff shall have until September 13, 2013, to obtain service on defendant. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tretheway v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tretheway
Represented By: Timothy J. Cuddigan
Represented By: Sean D. Cuddigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.