United States of America v. Kozak et al

Defendant: County of Washington, Randall David Due, Donna Marie Kozak and Karen A. Madsen
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2013cv00122
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify [her]self in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reaso nably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse [her]self from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). SO ORDERED. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
September 9, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1) Filing number 33 shall be removed from any pending motion list and reidentified as defendant Due's response to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. 2) Defendant Due's motions for copi es, (Filing Nos. 31 and 32 ) is granted only to the extent that the attached copy of his motion to strike will be sent to the defendant with this order. 3) A copy of this order shall be provided to Judge Urbom. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL )
April 10, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the court sua sponte. The plaintiff shall have to on or before April 24, 2015, to file a status report concerning whether the stay should continue in effect or whether the stay should be lifted. See NECivR 41.2. It is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed to pro se parties)(SLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kozak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Washington
Represented By: WASHINGTON COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall David Due
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Marie Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Madsen
Represented By: WASHINGTON COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.