United States of America v. Kozak et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
County of Washington, Randall David Due, Donna Marie Kozak and Karen A. Madsen |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00122 |
Filed: |
April 16, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
F.A. Gossett |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER sustaining 44 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed as to defendants County of Washington and Karen A. Madsen. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
April 10, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER - This matter is before the court sua sponte. The plaintiff shall have to on or before April 24, 2015, to file a status report concerning whether the stay should continue in effect or whether the stay should be lifted. See NECivR 41.2. It is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed to pro se parties)(SLP)
|
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1) Filing number 33 shall be removed from any pending motion list and reidentified as defendant Due's response to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. 2) Defendant Due's motions for copi es, (Filing Nos. 31 and 32 ) is granted only to the extent that the attached copy of his motion to strike will be sent to the defendant with this order. 3) A copy of this order shall be provided to Judge Urbom. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL )
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
18
ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify [her]self in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reaso nably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse [her]self from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). SO ORDERED. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?