Davis v. Washington County Nebraska States Attorneys Office
Petitioner: |
Robert Davis |
Respondent: |
Washington County Nebraska States Attorneys Office |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00145 |
Filed: |
May 1, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 30, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is deemed insufficient and the court will not act upon it. On or before August 26, 2013, Petitioner must submit a signed amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. In the amend ed petition, Petitioner must specify the grounds for relief, the facts supporting each ground, and the relief requested. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the Petition without further notice. The Clerk of the court is dir ected to send Petitioner a Form AO 241 packet, Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/26/2013:deadline for Petitioner to submit amended petition) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed)(MKR)
|
June 12, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Robert Davis shall pay the filing fee of $5.00 by 7/11/13. The Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the c ourt may dismiss this case without further notice. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/11/2013: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?