Sheikh v. United States of America Immigration Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: |
Ali Ahmed Sheikh |
Respondent: |
United States of America Immigration Customs Enforcement |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00184 |
Filed: |
June 21, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondents' first Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 4 ) is denied as moot. Respondents shall have until March 24, 2014, to supplement the record with sufficient evidence to show that Petitioner is no longer in custody. Th e Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 24, 2014: Check for supplement. Petitioner shall have until April 19, 2014, to file a response to Respondents' Second Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of the Petition 1 , the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claim that he is being unlawfully detained is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directe d to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondent, the United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska, and the Warden of the Douglas County Correctional Center by regular first-class mail. By September 30, 2013, Res pondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the § 2241 petition. No later than 30 days following the filing of Respondent's response, Petitioner shall file and serve a brief in response. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: September 30, 2013: Deadline for Respondent to answer or respond to 2241 petition. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copies mailed as directed) (ADB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?