June 4, 2018 |
Filing
74
ORDER : State Court Records filed as attachments to Filing No. 12 (1 CD), be returned to Erin Tangeman, counsel for Respondent, for appropriate disposition. The State Court Records may be picked up in Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Counsel's motion to withdraw, Filing No. 58 , is granted. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, Filing No. 60 , is denied. The defendant may not proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Robinson's amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Filing No. 39 ) is denied. A judgment in conformity with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. No certificate of appealability will be issued in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's objections, Filing No. 52 , are overruled. Plaintiff's motion for an evidentiary hearing, Filing No. 45 , is denied. The order of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 51 , is adopted in its entirety. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER - The petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (Filing No. 45 ) is denied. The respondent's Objection to Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (Filing No. 48 ) is sustained. Pursuant to NECivR 72.2 any objection to this Order shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order. Failure to timely object may constitute a waiver of any objection. The brief in support of any objection shall be filed at the time of filing such objection. Failure to file a brief in support of any objection may be deemed an abandonment of the objection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
|
February 17, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER - The petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 33 ) is granted. The petitioner shall have until February 27, 2015, to file the Amended Petition. The respondent's Objection to Motion to File Second Amended Petition (Filing No. 35 ) is overruled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (NMW)
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
32
ORDER - The respondent's Stipulation of Case Progression (Filing No. 30 ) is denied. The petitioner's Motion for Progression Order (Filing No. 31 ) is granted. The petitioner shall have to on or before January 26, 2015, to file a Moti on for Amended Petition or an amended brief on the merits of the current Petition. Absent a subsequent motion by either party, the standard briefing schedule provided in the local rules will apply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
27
ORDER - David Stickman and the Federal Public Defender's Office's Motion to Withdraw (Filing No. 26 ) is granted. Marnie A. Jensen and the firm Husch Blackwell, L.L.P., are appointed to represent Robinson in this matter pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3006A(a)(2)(B). Marnie A. Jensen shall promptly enter her appearance as counsel in this matter. No later than November 25, 2014, counsel for the petitioner and the respondent shall confer and file a joint motion suggesting a suit able progression of this matter. Following the filing of the joint motion, the court will enter an order progressing this matter to disposition. The clerk's office shall provide Marnie A. Jensen, the Federal Public Defender's Office, P etitioner, and the Nebraska Attorney General with a copy of this Order. In his capacity as administrator of the Criminal Justice Act panel, the Federal Public Defender shall provide Marnie A. Jensen with a CJA voucher. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies provided as directed)(GJG)
|
April 28, 2014 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 17 ) is granted. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the Petitioner in this matter. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed pro se party)(AOA)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. 8 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party).(AOA)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filingno. 6 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Petition on or before August 16, 2013. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further n otice. The Clerk of the court send to Petitioner the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: August 16, 2013: deadline to submit IFP application or pay $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|