Ford Motor Credit Company LLC v. Buchanan et al

Defendant: Shawn D. Buchanan and Howard L. Neuhaus
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv00225
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal (Filing No. 80 ) is approved; The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice; and The Court will not assess costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
December 18, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge by Joel Carney, counsel for plaintiff, On or before January 19, 2016, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shal l submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and The pretrial conference before the undersigned set for March 21, 2016, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 1/19/2016.)Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
July 20, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 63 Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2016 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
May 15, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 61 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. The deposition deadline for fact witnesses is 7/17/2015 and 9/30/2015 for expert witnesses. The Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to 12/21/2015 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. The jury trial before Chief Judge Smith Camp remains scheduled for 1/19/2016 at 8:30 AM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
December 15, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The stay previously entered is hereby lifted. A Planning Conference is set for 12/29/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, to be held by telephone call initiated by counsel for the plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC v. Buchanan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn D. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard L. Neuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Joanna Dickinson
Represented By: Craig A. Leslie
Represented By: Paul Morrison-Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?