Seabolt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Charles "Casey" Seabolt
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv00239
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER approving and adopting 55 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 42 Unopposed Motion to Extend Non-Trial Progression Order Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SECOND AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seabolt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles "Casey" Seabolt
Represented By: Joshua P. Wunderlich
Represented By: Robert G. Pahlke
Represented By: Kyle J. Long
Represented By: Robert O. Hippe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?