Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Counter Claimant: BNSF Railway Company
Counter Defendant: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Case Number: 8:2013cv00249
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before January 10, 2014, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of January 10, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate or Modify Preliminary Injunction (filing 44 ) is granted. The defendant may respond to the plaintiff's motion to vacat e or modify preliminary injunction (filing 41 ) on or before January 13, 2014. The plaintiff may reply in support of its motion on or before January 24, 2014. The parties shall report to the Court, on or before January 3, 2014, on the status of settlement. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a status report deadline of January 3, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (filing 8 ) is granted. The Brotherhood, and its officers, agents, employees, and members, are preliminarily enjoined from initiating or participating in any strike, work stoppage, or other self-help intended to interfere with BNSF's normal operations, pending a final judgment in this case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (filing 5 ) is granted. A hearing will be scheduled for September 25, 2013, to commence at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. A brief procedural prehearing teleconference will be scheduled before the undersigned judge in chambers at 1:30 p.m. on September 24, 2013. An email will be sent to counsel of record with instructions for participating in the prehearing conference. Parties shall deliver to the Court, on or before 1:30 p.m. on September 24, 2013, trial copies of any exhibits to be presented at the preliminary injunction hearing that have not already been placed in the record of the Court. The exhibits shall be in a three-ring binder organized for use by dividers or tabs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Represented By: David Pryor
Represented By: James A. Snowden
Represented By: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: David Pryor
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Represented By: James A. Snowden
Represented By: Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?