King et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Defendant: Acura Pharmaceuticals Inc., John Doe Pharmaceutical Companies 1-40, PLIVA, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Schwarz Pharma, Inc., Monte Scott, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Wyeth, LLC
Plaintiff: Cathy King and Steve King
Case Number: 8:2013cv00290
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 96 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Case Progression Deadlines. Any objection to this Order shall be filed with the Clerk within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 7, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 11/3/2014 order 56 regarding various disclosure deadlines is reaffirmed. Any motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 7/15/15. The court will conduct a telephone conference with counsel on 8/17/2015 at 10:00 AM for the purpose of scheduling this matter for trial. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate such telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
December 17, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF A PARTY - The Kings' and Acura's Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Acura Pharmaceuticals, Inc. without Prejudice (Filing No. 57 ) is approved. Claims asserted by the Kings against Acura in the above-captioned actio n are dismissed without prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney fees. If Acura is affirmatively identified in this action as a manufacturer, seller, distributor, or marketer of metoclopramide provided to Plaintiff Cathy Kin g, it will not assert a statute of limitations defense arising solely as a result of the passage of time between Acura's first receipt of the Kings' complaint and the filing of an amended complaint formally adding Acura as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
January 2, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 30 ) are adopted. The Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Cathy King and Steve King (Filing No. 22 ) is denied. Defendant Monte Scott , M.D., is dismissed as a defendant in these proceedings. The Clerk's office will modify the caption to reflect the dismissal of Monte Scott, M.D., as a Defendant. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
December 31, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 30 ) are adopted. The Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Cathy King and Steve King (Filing No.[ 22]) is denied. Defendant Monte Scott, M.D., is dismissed as a defendant in theseproceedings. The Clerk's office will modify the caption to reflect the dismissal of Monte Scott, M.D., as a Defendant. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA) Modified on 12/31/2013 (AOA) to add Memorandum.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acura Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Thomas E. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Pharmaceutical Companies 1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Mullin
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: Andrew J. Calica
Represented By: Robert W. Shively, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Scott
Represented By: James B. Luers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Mullin
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Mullin
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy King
Represented By: Mark R. Richardson
Represented By: Peter C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve King
Represented By: Mark R. Richardson
Represented By: Peter C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?