Griffin v. Wolvin
Plaintiff: Eric A. Griffin
Defendant: Carolyn W. Wolvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2013cv00365
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1) Plaintiff's application for attorneys fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, (filing no. 27 ), is granted; and2) By separate document, the court will enter judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendan t providing that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees of $6225.00.3) This EAJA fee is payable to Plaintiff as the litigant and may be subject to offset to satisfy a pre-existing debt that the litigant owes to the United States. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Eric A. Griffin. Judgment shall be entered by separate document, providing that the Commissioner's decision is reversed and the case remanded for further proceedings pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that to avoid any delays in resolving this case, 1) If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before July 7, 2014, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNM ENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the courts website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. 2) In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall file the original complaint and the accompanying pleadings without the prepayment of costs or fees. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summo n upon Carolyn W. Wolvin, Commissioner of the Social Security; Eric J. Holder, United States Attorney General; and Deborah R. Gilg United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska, and return such summonses to plaintiffs counsel for service on the individuals named therein pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 4. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Wolvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Wolvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A. Griffin
Represented By: Shirley Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?