Lasher et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Herold, Michael Hornbacher, Laura Lasher, Cynthia Mullins, Guthrie Steen and Russell Williams
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Corp., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Case Number: 8:2014cv00030
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE. The defendant's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date 79 is granted. Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2015 in Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The parties' motion (Filing No. 8 ) is granted. The defendant has until March 20, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasher et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Herold
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hornbacher
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lasher
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mullins
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guthrie Steen
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Williams
Represented By: Brian C. Hansen
Represented By: Melvin C. Hansen
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Represented By: Susan M. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?