January 14, 2019 |
Filing
190
ORDER - The Clerk of the Court shall disburse $26,143.35 via check payable to the Hogan Lovells law firm, at: ATTN Lauren Colton Hogan Lovells Law Firm 100 International Drive Suite 2000 Baltimore, MD 21202. The Clerk of the Court shall refund the remaining $1,856.65 to plaintiff's counsel, via check payable to Excolo Law, at: Excolo Law 26700 Lahser Road, Suite 401 Southfield, MI 48033. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy provided to Finance) (LKO)
|
July 17, 2017 |
Filing
172
ORDER that Altman's objection (filing 164 ) is overruled. Altman is ordered to pay the defendants the sum of $25,665.00 on or before August 17, 2017. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
|
September 29, 2016 |
Filing
127
ORDER - The plaintiff's objection to the Magistrate Judge's August 11, 2016 Order on discovery (filing 116 ) is overruled. The plaintiff's motion to strike the defendants' request for sanctions (filing 122 ) is denied. The defendants' motion for sanctions, if any, shall be filed on or before October 12, 2016. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
115
ORDER that on or before September 12, 2016, Plaintiff's counsel shall serve complete expert disclosures for all experts expected to testify at trial on behalf of the Plaintiff, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retai ned experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), on the issue of whether ingesting Enbrel can cause MDS. Plaintiff's motion to compel further depositions of Defendants' employees, (Filing No. 106 ), is denied without prejudice. Further depositi ons may later be permitted upon a showing that Plaintiff can present scientifically reliable evidence and opinions supporting the allegation that Enbrel can cause MDS. The telephonic hearing scheduled for August 18, 2016 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
112
ORDER OF RECUSAL REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in whi ch his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LAC)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing
105
ORDER that Plaintiff's anticipated motion to compel discovery of documents and to depose additional witnesses, including 30(b)(6) witnesses, shall be filed on or before July 1, 2016, with Defendant's response due on or before July 13, 2016 . No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. The deposition of Jan Isles will re-convene under direct court supervision in the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge beginning at 10:00 a.m. on August 10, 2016. Counsel shall provide the court reporter for this deposition. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Objection to Portions of Magistrates March 28, 2016 Order on Discovery (Filing No. 88 ) is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
May 9, 2016 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendants' motion for protective order, (Filing No. 90 ), is granted. No depositions will be taken or noticed until Judge Smith Camp rules on Plaintiff's objection, (Filing No. 88 ), to my order dated March 28, 2016, (Filing No. 83 ). Plaintiff's motion for clarification, (Filing No. 86 ), is denied. On or before May 23, 2016, Attorney Solomon Radner shall either enter an appearance and thereby submit to this court's rules governing attorney conduct, or cease representation of Plaintiff in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
85
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 84 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
57
ORDER - After conferring with the parties,1) On or before June 12, 2015, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a motion for clarification, along with a brief citing any relevant case law and treatises, explaining his position on the appropri ate scope of discovery on the issue of general medical causation; that is, whether ingesting the prescription drug, Enbrel (etanercept) can cause myelodysplastic syndrome ("MDS").2) Defense counsel's response shall be filed on or b efore June 26, 2015.3) No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown.4) Counsel shall cite any relevant Eighth Circuit or Supreme Court case law on the case management issue presented, irrespective of whether they deem it "controlling" under the facts of this case.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
37
ORDER setting Lone-Pine motion deadlines.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 10 . Plaintiff is given leave to file an Amended Complaint on or before 10/14/14. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Filing No. 23 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|