Yeransian v. Markel Corporation
Plaintiff: Luke Yeransian
Defendant: Markel Corporation
Case Number: 8:2014cv00063
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Plaintiff's complaint, and Defendants' counterclaim, are dismissed with prejudice, terminating this action. Each party shall pay their own costs and attorney fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for replevin, Filing No. 13 , is denied as moot as set forth herein. The order to hold all property relevant to this lawsuit, as set forth by the magistrate judge, Filing No. 16 , shall remain in fu ll force and effect. The motion to dismiss, Filing No. 10 , is granted with regard to the claim for fraud, but the motion is denied with regard to all other causes of action. The plaintiff shall have 10 days from the date of this order to amend his complaint for fraud, if he chooses to do so. The magistrate judge is ordered to progress this case as set forth herein. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - The hearing on the Motion for Replevin 13 , set for May 13, 2014 at 9:30 A.M., is cancelled. Defendant shall submit their argument by affidavits by the close of business on Monday, May 12, 2014. Plaintiff shall submit their argument by affidavits by the close of business on Friday, May 16, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeransian v. Markel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Corporation
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Rodney A. Satterwhite
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Yeransian
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James D. Sherrets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?