Fjellin et al v. Penning et al
Plaintiff: |
Jacqueline C. Fjellin and James J. Van Liew |
Defendant: |
Myron Kaplan, McGill Gotsdiner Workman & Lepp, P.C., L.L.O., Marvin Penning and Mary Penning |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00077 |
Filed: |
March 6, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
55
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 54 Joint Motion to Extend. - Depositions due 6/15/2016.- 4-day Jury Trial set for 10/24/2016 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. - Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2016 at 1:00 PM by WebEx Conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Conferencing instructions will be provided by separate order.- Telephone Conference set for 6/21/2016 at 10:30 AM with Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement. Counsel for the plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion to Extend. Deadlines extended as stated herein. Telephone Conference continued to 4/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint (Filing 32 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying 21 Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Rule 12(b)(6) motion (Filing 10 ) filed by defendants Myron Kaplan and McGill, Gotsdiner, Workman & Lepp. P.C., L.L.O., is granted, and Plaintiffs' cause of action against such defendants based on Neb. Rev. Stat. U. C.C. § 9-625 and negligence are dismissed. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a motion to amend the complaint to assert claims against defendants Myron Kaplan and McGill, Gotsdiner, Workman & Lepp. P.C., L.L.O., related to the allegation t hat defendant Kaplan caused sale proceeds to be kept from the Trust. Any motion for leave to file an amended complaint shall be filed in strict compliance with NECivR 15.1 on or before September 19, 2014, in the absence of which defendants Myron Kaplan and McGill, Gotsdiner, Workman & Lepp. P.C., L.L.O., shall be dismissed from this matter without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?