United States of America v. 2.28 Acres of Land, More Or Less, Situated In Perkins County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2.28 Acres of Land, More Or Less, Situated In Perkins County, Nebraska, Agribank, FCB, Molly Dickinson, Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Julie Fjell, Scott Fjell and Persons Unknown
Case Number: 8:2014cv00085
Filed: March 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358 Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The government's motion in limine, Filing No. 57 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting the defendants' Unopposed 61 Motion for Extension of Time and Progression Deadlines. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Depositions due March 31, 2015. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2015 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE- The parties' Joint 31 Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines is granted as set forth herein. Trial is set to commence, at the courts call, during the week of May 26, 2015, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that all defendants to this action and all persons in possession or control of the property described in the Complaint filed herein shall surrender to Plaintiff possession of said property to the extent of the estate or interest being condemned, as of this date, provided that a notice of this order shall be served upon all persons in possession or control of said property forthwith. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2.28 Acres of Land, More Or Less, Situated In Perkins County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.28 Acres of Land, More Or Less, Situated In Perkins County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribank, FCB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Dickinson
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Fjell
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fjell
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?