Dobrovolny et al v. Rain and Hail, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Curtis L. Carr, Stanley D. Dobrovolny, Robert J. Kaup, Terrance N. Klinger, Thomas J. Krysl, Rod R. McCumber, Dale Paxton, Darrin J. Paxton, Mike Pospichal and Jerry Prewitt |
Defendant: |
Rain and Hail, LLC |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00116 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 29 Stipulation for Dismissal. The entire action, including all claims and counterclaims stated therein, is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall bear all of their own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting 25 Stipulation for Dismissal that the Plaintiff Thomas J. Krysl is dismissed from the above-entitled matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees incurred as a result hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 7 , is denied as moot. Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 15 , is granted with respect to the motion to compel arbitration and denied in all other respects at thi s time. The defendant is free to reassert this motion to dismiss following the arbitration process, if applicable. This case is hereby stayed pending arbitration in this case. The parties shall seek to immediately arbitrate this case pursuant to the arbitration agreement entered into by them. The parties are instructed to provide the court with a status update every 60 days until this case is determined by the arbitrator. The parties shall notify the court immediately if the case is settled and/or when the arbitration process is completed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER that Attorney Karen Budd-Falen has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Ms. Budd-Falen is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why she is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?