Richardson International (US) Limited et al v. Buhler Inc
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company and Richardson International (US) Limited
Defendant: Buhler Inc
Case Number: 8:2014cv00148
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER TO DESTROY: Counsel for the plaintiff notified the court on January 19, 2018 and counsel for the defendant notified the court on January 11, 2018 that they wish the trial exhibits held by the court in this matter be destroyed. Pursuant NECivR 79.1(f) or NECrimR 55.1(g), if counsel fails to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk's office is directed to destroy the above-listed exhibits 14 days from the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 145 Stipulation for Dismissal. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, and that each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in relation to this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that upon notice of settlement given to the judge on May 12, 2017, by plaintiffs' counsel, IT IS ORDERED that: On or before June 12, 2017, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive sti pulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ON FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Counsel estimate the length of trial will consume not less than 3 days, not more than 12 days, and probably about 8 days. Trial is set for May 8, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion in limine (Filing No. 92 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' motion in limine (Filing No. 96 ) is granted in part and denied, without prejudice in part, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 80 Motion in Limine to exclude certain testimony of the plaintiffs' experts Kenneth R. Scurto, James E. Maness, and Dr. Thomas Schnell. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Joint Stipulation Concerning Pretrial Deadlines, Filing No. 103 . The proposed amendments are adopted. IT IS ORDERED that the joint stipulation, Filing No. 103 is granted. The Final Pretrial Con ference with the undersigned judge is set for April 11, 2017, at 1:30 P.M., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 3259, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER, setting a Settlement Conference for 1/10/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Settlement conference statements are due at Noon on 1/6/2017.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER granting 58 Joint Stipulations Concerning Scheduling Order. The deadlines are amended as requested and as set out in this order. The 1/10/2017 pretrial conference date and the 2/13/2017 trial date remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER- The parties' 55 Stipulation for Protective Order is approved by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Continue Trial. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. A Jury Trial is set for 2/13/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Court house, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. The motion for summary judgment currently pending in this case 46 is deemed withdrawn and may be re-filed in accordance with the deadlines set forth in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER -Defendant's Motion for Reasonable Attorney Fees and Costs 40 is granted, in part. Defendant is hereby awarded $2500.00 for the filing of its Motion to Compel and Renewed Motion to Compel. Said amount shall be paid or offset at the conclusion of this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Compel Answers to Written Discovery 32 is granted. Plaintiffs shall supplement their responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents within 14 days of this Order. Plaintiffs shall also produce a privilege log and supplement their discovery responses so as to identify, by Bates number, the documents responsive to each document production request within 14 days of this Order. By June 23, 2015, Defendant shall submit a motion for reasonable attorneys' fees, which includes an itemization of costs incurred in bringing its original and renewed motion to compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson International (US) Limited et al v. Buhler Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buhler Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald G. Beattie
Represented By: Nile Hicks
Represented By: Patrick J. Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richardson International (US) Limited
Represented By: Donald G. Beattie
Represented By: Nile Hicks
Represented By: Patrick J. Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?