June 15, 2016 |
Filing
137
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Court has been advised that the parties in this case have settled their claims, accordingly, On or before July 15, 2016, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together w ith submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from th e Court's trial docket. The plaintiff's motion in limine (filing 133 ) and the defendants' motion in limine (filing 130 ) are denied as moot. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 7/15/2016.), Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR, )
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing
135
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Quash for the reasons stated on the record, (Filing No. 115 . The jury trial of this case remains set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in the Special Proceeding s Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on June 20, 2016, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of six (6) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing
103
ORDER granting 94 Motion to Compel as more fully stated in the order. Defendant's 99 Motion to Strike is granted. Plaintiff shall pay half of the invoice, $750.00. Defendant shall pay half of the invoice, $750.00 Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
93
ORDER granting 85 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's disclosure of David Hall, as either an expert or fact witness, is stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing
78
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 77 Joint Motion to Continue. - Depositions due 1/29/2016.- 4-day Jury Trial set for 4/18/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge John M. Gerrard. - Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2016 at 2:00 PM by WebEx Conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx located at Filing No. 54 .Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
October 27, 2015 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendant's 70 Motion to Strike. The plaintiffs objection to the defendants' motion for summary judgment 67 is overruled. The plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 67 is stricken. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying the plaintiff's 39 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
37
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial Date (Filing No. 36 ) is granted. - Depositions due 7/15/2015.- 4-day Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge John M. Gerrard. - Pre trial Conference set for 10/20/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx Conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx.- Telephone Conference set for 7/21/2015 at 8:30 AM with Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart to discuss the status of this case.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Motion 28 - 1) The plaintiff's objection, (Filing No. 27 ), is sustained and the defendant's motion, (Filing No. 28 ), is denied.2) On or before December 5, 2014, the plaintiff shall produce his medical records from Sidney Regional Medical Center and Banner Health for the last five years. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|