Woodruff v. Foxall et al
Petitioner: |
Johnny R. Woodruff |
Respondent: |
Tammy, Mark Foxall, Dr. Morin and Douglas County Correctional Center |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00211 |
Filed: |
July 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to apprise the court of his current address in the absence of which this matter will be dismissed without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 19, 2014: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that sets forth viable claims for relief against Defendants. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, or the court finds that the amended complaint is insufficient, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate t he allegations of the current Complaint and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 1, 2014: Check for amended complaint. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis 5 is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 1, 2014: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form as directed)(GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?