December 7, 2015 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (Filing 50 ) is adopted. This case is dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and NECivR 41.2. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER THAT IT IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Richard G. Kopf, United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice as a discovery sanction or for want of prosecution without furt her notice. The parties are notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the courts adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) Modified on 11/9/2015 to include copy maile to pro se party (LAC).
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER - 1. Defendants' motion to deem facts admitted, (Filing No. 48 ), is granted. Defendants' requests for admissions, (Filing No. 48 -3), are deemed admitted.2. Defendants' motion to compel, (Filing No. 47 ), is granted, and - a. The plaintiff is given 14 days, or until October 5, 2015, to serve on the defendants his mandatory disclosures and his full and complete responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production. - b. On or befor e October 8, 2015, the plaintiff shall file a certificate of service on the court's record as required under this court's local rules stating he has timely served his discovery responses as required under this order.3. Failure to timely comply with paragraph 2 of this order may result in dismissal of this case as a discovery sanction or for want of prosecution.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
45
ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw filed by Attorney George B. Achola as counsel on behalf of Defendants Cindy Cosentino, Omaha Housing Authority, and Clifford Scott, (Filing No. 44 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB) Modified on 6/18/2015 to reflect copy mailed to pro se party. (JAB)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER that - On or before July 6, 2015, attorney George B. Achola, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing George B. Achola as counsel of record in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
40
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - This case has been reassigned to U. S. District Judge Richard G. Kopf for final disposition (Filing 39). The final progression order is amended as follows: The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before Ri chard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on April 4, 2016, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
April 15, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Objection to Court Orders (filing 26 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
March 13, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave. The defendants answer, a copy of which is attached to its motion, shall be filed on or before March 18, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against Defendants may proceed and service is warranted. To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of t he court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: March 31, 2015: Check for completion of service of summons. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 6 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party 3 summonses and 285 forms)(GJG)
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filing 2 , is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|