Dillard v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: John C. Dillard
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2014cv00219
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine 30 is granted, in part, as set forth in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: Trial Preparation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MLF, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 15 Motion in Limine. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MLF, )
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 19 the Joint Stipulation. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's 3/10/2015 motion in limine by 4/24/2015. Deposition deadline set for 9/10/2015. The pretrial conference is set for 11/9/2015 at 9:30 A.M., in chambers. The jury trial before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett is set for 12/8/2015 at 9:00 A.M., in Courtroom 6 on the 2nd Floor of the Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett for final disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Dillard
Represented By: Edward F. Noethe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Betty L. Egan
Represented By: Richard C. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?