July 25, 2016 |
Filing
105
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 84 is granted; The case is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted. The case is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until March 29, 2016, to file a response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 84 . Defendants shall have until April 5, 2016, to file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
81
ORDER Plaintiff's requests (filing 79 ) shall be granted, in part. A revised pre-trial order shall be submitted to the Court no later than March 2, 2016. Plaintiff shall provide her proposed additions and/or deletions to defense counsel by Feb ruary 17, 2016. Defense counsel has no obligation to contact Plaintiff in an effort to obtain Plaintiffs changes. Defense counsel shall submit the revised order to the Court in accordance with the deadline. If no changes are necessary due to Plaintif fs failure to communicate with defense counsel regarding this matter, counsel shall so inform the Court. If a party proposes an addition or deletion which is not agreed to by all the other parties, that fact should be noted in the text of the docume nt. The revised order must be signed by the pro se party and by counsel for all represented parties. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. All parties (or their attorneys) must attend the Pretrial Conference in Omaha.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed as directed)(MKR)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's October 13, 2015, Order (Filing No. 47 ) are overruled; and Plaintiff's Request for de novo Ruling and Motion to Stay (Filing No. 50 ) are denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
59
ORDER - Plaintiff's Request that Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 and 26 be Recognized and Followed (filing 48 ) is denied. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (filing 49 ) is denied. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Supplemental C omplaint (filing 51 ) is denied. Plaintiffs Discovery Request (filing 55 ) is stricken from the record. Defendants Motion for Sanctions (filing 54 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the address on file with the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (MKR)
|
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Admissions Late andProduce Documents (filing 40 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall provide full responses to Defendants' discovery requests by October 27, 2015. Plaintiffs Applicatio n for Court-Appointed Counsel (filing 42 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief is denied at this time. Plaintiff's Request to Put Progression Order on Hold (filing 41 ) is denied as moot. Def endants Motion to Compel (filing 43 ) is granted, in part. Plaintiff shall provide full responses to Defendants' discovery requests by October 27, 2015. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (MKR)
|
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 23 ) is denied; Bartling's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 16 ) is granted; Bartling is dismissed as a defendant from the above-captioned action; and Defendant s City of Sidney, Nebraska, Joanie Matthes, Jordan Ball, and Gary Pearson, in their official capacities, will respond to the Amended Complaint on or before July 10, 2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter may proceed to service of process against the City of Sidney, Nebraska; Jony Mathews (spelled "Joanie Matthes" in NEOC's Final Investigative Report); Jordan Ball; Gary Pearson; and Lori Bartling. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate as parties those Defendants not named in the Amended Complaint. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/25/2015: check for completion of service of summos) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed with (5) summons forms and (5) USM 285 Forms)(MKR)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that clearly states a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended compla int, Plaintiffs claims against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/8/2014: Check for amended complaint onDecember 8, 2014) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|