Tardy v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: James G. Tardy
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 8:2014cv00266
Filed: September 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
May 11, 2015 Filing 30 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge on March 18, 2015. On or before May 18, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled planning conference and any other deadlines are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 5/18/2015.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
February 19, 2015 Filing 28 RETURN of service of subpoena by registered mail on 02192015 upon CT Corporation, registered agent for USAA by Attorney Brad E. Miller on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Miller, Brad)
January 6, 2015 Filing 27 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #25 by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company(Svoboda, John)
December 31, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE Amended Notice of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Svoboda, John)
December 31, 2014 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company, by Attorney Richard A. Drews on behalf of James G. Tardy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of PR)(Drews, Richard)
December 31, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Svoboda, John)
December 3, 2014 Filing 23 RETURN of service of Subpoena on 12-3-2014 upon Veronica Arellano at USAA by Attorney Brad E. Miller on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Miller, Brad)
December 3, 2014 Filing 22 RETURN of service of Subpoena on 12-3-2014 upon Allstate Insurance Company by Attorney Brad E. Miller on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Miller, Brad)
December 1, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant Ford Motor Company's First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Svoboda, John)
November 17, 2014 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE Ford Motor Company's Initial Disclosure Statement by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
November 17, 2014 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Richard A. Drews on behalf of Plaintiff James G. Tardy.(Drews, Richard)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER adopting #17 the parties' Stipulation for Substitution of Plaintiff. The plaintiff is granted leave to substitute James G. Tardy, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia A. Tardy in place of James G. Tardy, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of Virginia A. Tardy. The Clerk of Court shall amend the caption to reflect the substitution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 23, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Substitution of Plaintiff by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00 a.m. on June 11, 2015. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by January 9, 2015 addressing mediation requirements. Planning Conference set for 6/11/2015 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
October 3, 2014 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
September 26, 2014 Filing 14 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Brad E. Miller for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MKR)
September 26, 2014 Filing 13 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Sherry A. Rozell for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MKR)
September 26, 2014 Filing 12 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Rodney E. Loomer for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MKR)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING LETTER setting Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline for October 6, 2014. Please use the "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the court's website, www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 12, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint Type, #2 with with jury demand by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company(Svoboda, John)
September 11, 2014 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sherry A. Rozell has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL, )
September 11, 2014 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Rodney E. Loomer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL, )
September 11, 2014 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brad E. Miller has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL, )
September 11, 2014 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken assigned. (ELE, )
September 10, 2014 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
September 10, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal of Suit by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Svoboda, John)
September 10, 2014 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of John Svoboda regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint Type #2 by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Svoboda, John)
September 10, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand Amended against James G. Tardy Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-2781034 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Ford Motor Company(Svoboda, John) Modified on 9/11/2014 to add filing fee receipt information. (ELE, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) with jury demand against James G. Tardy ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-2781034) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney John A. Svoboda on behalf of Ford Motor Company(Svoboda, John) Modified on 9/11/2014 to correct document title, attorney filed incorrect document. (ELE, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tardy v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Tardy
Represented By: David D. Ernst
Represented By: Richard A. Drews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brad E. Miller
Represented By: John A. Svoboda
Represented By: Rodney E. Loomer
Represented By: Sherry A. Rozell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?