Global Tower, LLC et al v. Great Western Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
GTP Infrastructure I, LLC and Global Tower, LLC |
Defendant: |
Christopher J. Jensen, LLC, Great Western Communications, LLC, JRS Associates, LLC, Kenneth D. Anderson, LLC, Pinpoint Communications, Inc., Pinpoint Network Solutions, LLC and Tri-Com, LLC |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00269 |
Filed: |
September 11, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
F.A. Gossett |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
72
ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the parties' 71 Stipulation for Dismissal is approved; The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice; and The Court will not assess costs or attorneys fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing
56
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before September 4, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate John Walker's appearance as counsel for Defendants and shall terminate future notices to Mr. Walker in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MLF, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Global Tower, LLC et al v. Great Western Communications, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Christopher J. Jensen, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Great Western Communications, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: JRS Associates, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kenneth D. Anderson, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Pinpoint Communications, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Pinpoint Network Solutions, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tri-Com, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth A. Culhane |
Represented By: |
John M. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: GTP Infrastructure I, LLC |
Represented By: |
William N. Aumenta |
Represented By: |
Matthew M. Enenbach |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Global Tower, LLC |
Represented By: |
William N. Aumenta |
Represented By: |
Matthew M. Enenbach |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?