Bauer v. Cox Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Michelle Bauer |
Defendant: |
Aetna Life Insurance Company, Cox Enterprises, Inc. and Cox Enterprises, Inc., Welfare Benefits Plan |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00324 |
Filed: |
October 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: E.R.I.S.A. |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 19, 2021 |
Filing
93
STRICKEN-ORDER - Nevarez-Carreon is denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Nevarez- Carreon at his last known address; and The Clerk of Court is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copies mailed as directed) (MKR) Modified on 4/19/2021 to strike per Order 94. (MKR).
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
92
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 91 Stipulation for Dismissal. It is hereby ordered that the above referenced matter is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER that on or before March 1, 2017, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft o rder which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled hearing set for January 31, 2017 is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting in part 80 Motion to Extend. The deadline to meet and confer and file a motion for attorney fees is extended to January 13, 2017. A hearing is set for January 17, 2017 at 1:30pm in the event the parties are unable to resolve the issues. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER granting 77 Motion to Extend. The deadline for the parties to meet and confer and the deadline for the Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees are hereby extended for thirty (30) days from October 17, 2016 to November 16, 2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing
41
PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 40 Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER that the defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Filing No. 26) is denied. The plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Filing No. 29) is granted. The defendants shall have until August 21, 2015, to respond to the plaintiff's discovery requests, as modified in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MBM)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, BY THIS COURT, AS FOLLOWS: That Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice from the above captioned matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?