Krupnikovic et al v. Sterling Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bozana Krupnikovic
Defendant: James Ganser, LW Miller Transportation Holdings, Inc., Sterling Transportation Services, Inc. and Unknown Spouse, Heirs, Devisees, Legatees, Executors, Administrators, and Assigns
Case Number: 8:2014cv00352
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, by the Court, that the caption matter should be, and it hereby is, dismissed, with prejudice, complete record waived, with each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motions for summary judgment (Filing Nos. 161 and 163 ) are granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Defendants' Daubert motions in limine (Filing Nos. 157 and 159 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER - Plaintiff concedes the claims set forth in LW Miller and Ganser's partial motions for summary judgment are ripe for dismissal. Accordingly, Defendants LW Miller Transportation Holdings, Inc. and James Ganser's Partial Motions for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 153 and Filing No. 155 ) are granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER - The Agreed Motion to Extend Dates for Defendants' Expert Depositions and to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions in Limine (Filing No. 165 ) is granted. Plaintiff's responses to the pending motions for partial summary judgment and motions in limine (Filing Nos. 153 , 155 , 157 , 159 , 161 , and 163 ) are due by April 9, 2017. Defendants may file a reply by April 19, 2017. The final pretrial conference currently set for April 24, 2017, and the trial currently set for May 16, 2017, shall be continued to a later date by further order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 147 Second Stipulated Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2017 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RESCHEDULING THE TRIAL DATE. The Jury Trial is rescheduled to 5/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. All other unexpired deadlines, including the pretrial conference date of March 20, 2017, remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 132 Stipulated Motion to Extend Progression Order. The deadlines are amended as set out in this order. The 3/20/2017 pretrial conference and the 4/25/2017 trial dates are not changed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER - Sterling's motion to quash or for protective order (Filing No. 122 ) is denied. Sterling shall produce a representative in accordance with the Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition (Filing No. 111 ). However, the topics to be covered during the deposition is limited by this order as set forth above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - L.W. Miller Transportation Holdings, Inc., and James Ganser's Amended Motion to Quash (Filing No. 120 ) is denied. L.W. Miller shall produce a representative in accordance with the Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition (Filing No. 110 ). However, the topics to be covered during the deposition is limited by this order as set forth above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying 114 Defendants' Motion to Quash. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER regarding 68 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (filing 68) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Bryan Kirsch, Stephen Brandenburg and Thomas Cameli as counsel of record for Sterling Transportation Services, Inc. and shall terminate future notices to them in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed to counsel)(SLP) Modified on 2/23/2015 to reflect mailing (SLP).
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before February 20, 2015, attorneys John R. Ostojic, Thomas F. Cameli, Bryan J. Kirsch, and Stephen M. Brandenburg, are to register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed to attorneys) (SLP) Modified on 2/6/2015 to indicate copies mailed (SLP).
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearances of Michael Huber, David Farina and Anthony Sam as counsel for L.W. Miller and shall terminate future notices to them in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SLP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krupnikovic et al v. Sterling Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ganser
Represented By: Rene C. Lapierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LW Miller Transportation Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Rene C. Lapierre
Represented By: David J. Farina
Represented By: Michael D. Huber
Represented By: Anthony M. Sam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Braddy
Represented By: Stephen M. Brandenburg
Represented By: Thomas F. Cameli
Represented By: Bryan J. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse, Heirs, Devisees, Legatees, Executors, Administrators, and Assigns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bozana Krupnikovic
Represented By: John R. Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?