Deas v. Kenney et al
Plaintiff: Robert Deas
Defendant: Kevin Bergstrom, Kieth Broadfoot, Brian Gage, Ryan Holley, Michael L. Kenney, Randy Kohl, Richard Thomas, Mark Weilage and Cameron S. White
Case Number: 8:2015cv00035
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the Court's order dated July 29, 2015, this action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Deas will have 30 days in which to file a second amended complaint in accordance with this order. Failure to file a second amended complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this action without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set the followings pro se case management deadline: August 28, 2015: check for second amended complaint; dismiss if none filed. To avoid confusion, any document Deas sends to the clerk of the court for fili ng in this case must clearly display the case number. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/28/2015: check for second amended complaint; dismiss if none filed) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days in accordance with this order. This case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff' s request for class certification is denied. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a civil complaint form. To avoid confusion, any document Plaintiff sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: May 27, 2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with civil complaint form)(GJG)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Robert Deas shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $75.62 by March 2, 2015 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is gr anted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those paym ents to the court. The clerks office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/2/2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deas v. Kenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieth Broadfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weilage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?