United States of America v. $15,480.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $15,480.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2015cv00043
Filed: January 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - As previously ordered (Filing No. 84 ), the parties shall have until February 9, 2018, to electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal or other dispositive stipulation. Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - The parties shall have an extension of time to January 8, 2018, to electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal or other dispositive stipulation. If on January 8, 2018, the Claimant has not yet been paid in full per the parties' settlement agreement, Plaintiff shall file an updated Status Report in lieu of filing the dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - Claimant's Motion (Filing No. 43 ) is granted, in part, and denied in part. All motions to dismiss or for summary judgment shall be filed not later than May 18, 2017. Any motion to amend pleadings and/or add parties shall be filed not later than April 21, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - The Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings (Filing No. 32 ) is granted. This case shall be stayed until February 17, 2017. By February 17, 2017, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed amended progression order for this case to basis� 64;ned.uscourts.gov. The clerk of court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 17, 2017: Check for proposed amended progression order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR PROGRESSION OF FORFEITURE CASE - The plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and Issue New Progression Order (Filing No. 29 ) is granted. In lieu of a final pretrial conference, counsel and any pro se parties shall prepare a proposed final pretrial conference order in accordance with NECivR 16.2 and submit it to the assigned magistrate judge by March 31, 2017. In the event the court requires additional information or a conference with counsel and any pro se parties, the court will arrange a telephone conference after receipt of the proposed final pretrial conference order. Trial is tentatively scheduled for one trial day the week of April 17, 2017. A specific trial date will be set by the court at the time of the filing of the final pretrial conference order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - The government's motion (Filing No. 19 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The claimant's motion (Filing No. 16 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $15,480.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,480.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?