January 12, 2018 |
Filing
155
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's Notice (Filing No. 154 ). The clerk of court is directed to provide a copy of this order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's notice of appeal. (Filing No. 145 .) The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's notice of appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
144
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Notice (Filing No. 143 ) is denied to the extent that it seeks to renew any of Plaintiff's motions which the court previously denied on November 20, 2017. The clerk's office is directed to amend the text of docket entry No. 142 to correctly identify Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf as the ordering judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
May 3, 2017 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's notice of appeal. (Filing No. 120 ) The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's notice of appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's notice of appeal. (Filing No. 112 .) The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's notice of appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's pending motions (Filing No. 102 ; Filing No. 106 ) are denied. This case is closed and Plaintiff is not entitled to the relief she seeks. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy emailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
97
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's notice of appeal. (Filing No. 96 ). The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's notice of appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on either of Plaintiff's notices of appeal. (Filing Nos. 80 , 90 .) The clerk of court is directed to send copies of Plaintiff's notices of appeal (Filing Nos. 80 , 90 ) to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 93 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(LAC, )
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal. The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal (Filing No. 86) to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
|
September 29, 2016 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 73 ) is denied. The clerk of the court is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy to USCA)(CS)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $505.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 30, 2016: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed with AO240 form to pro se party) (CS)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 58 Motion to Withdraw Document. It appears that Plaintiff meant to file her Notice with the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal, along with a copy of this Memorandum and Order, to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party.)(JAB)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis 54 is denied. The clerk of the court is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Copy provided to USCA-Eighth Circuit. (CS)
|
August 12, 2016 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification (FilingNo. 51 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court will not act on Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal. The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal (Filing No. 33 ) to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies emailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC) Modified on 6/14/2016 to include copies emailed to pro se party. (LAC).
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Injunction (Filing No. 25 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 3 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's miscellaneous motions (Filing No. 4 ) are denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|