United States of America for the use of Donald B. Murphy Contractors v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Donald B. Murphy Contractors
Defendant: KiewitPhelps, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00048
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS ORDERED that the claims in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and expenses, including attorney's fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER - that KP's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Filing No. 183 ) is granted, in part. DBM shall produce the following documents (as identified on DBM's Privilege Log) within seven (7) days of this order: Doc. Nos. 13, 15, 16, 1 7, 18, 21, 22, 26, 32, 35, 40 (may redact second paragraph of November 24, 2013 email), 41, 46, 47, 94, 96, 107, 108, 114, 118, 129, 130, 131 (may redact second paragraph of November 24, 2013 email), 137, 167, 170, 173, 175, 185, 186, 187, 198, 199, 201, 202, 206 and 207. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Treviicos South, Inc.'s, motion in limine (Filing No. 117) is denied. KiewitPhelps' motion in limine (Filing No. 119) is denied. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's motion in limine (Filing N o. 123) is denied. KiewitPhelps' motion in limine (Filing No. 122) is denied, without prejudice to reassertion. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's motion in limine (Filing No. 125) is denied, without prejudice to reassert ion. KiewitPhelps' motion in limine (Filing No. 127) is denied. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America's motion in limine (Filing No. 130) is denied. KiewitPhelps' motion in limine (Filing No. 200) is denied, without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER AND EIGHTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 204 Motion to Amend as set forth within the order. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 22, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. in chambers with the assigned magistrate judge. Jury Trial is set to commence at the court's call, during the week of September 18, 2017 before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER - The parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for the Deposition of Michael Murphy (Filing No. 159 ) is granted as set forth below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The provisions of the Court's previous orders remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following date changes shall apply: The deadline for the deposition of Michael Murphy is extended to February 14, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SIXTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS SO ORDERED: The parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 143 ) is granted as set forth below. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED: The provisions of the Court's previous orders remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following date changes shall apply: 1. Deadline for filing motions to compel relating to the following subjects is exte nded to January 30, 2017: a) KP's production of documents set forth in the November 20, 2016 email from Becki Ashbaugh and the follow-up emails related thereto; b) DBM's privilege log; and c) Claims and information set forth in KP's December 7, 2016 Second Supplemental Discovery Responses. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FOURTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE. IT IS SO ORDERED: The parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 105 ) is granted as set forth below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The provisions of the Court's previous orders remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following date changes shall apply: Deadline for motions for summary judgement and motions in limine challenging the admissibility of expert testimony at trial under Fed. R. Evid. 702 are extended to December 22, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 103 ) is granted as set forth below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Th e provisions of the Court's previous orders remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following date changes shall apply: Deadline for depositions, and associated discovery deadlines, is extended to December 15, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The parties' Unopposed Joint Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 77 ) is granted as set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 75 Joint Stipulation to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case. Depositions due 7/29/2016. Jury Trial set for January 23, 2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Rom an L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 73 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SMN)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 66 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Donald B. Murphy Contractors v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KiewitPhelps
Represented By: Jeremy T. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Michael P. Grace
Represented By: David Groff
Represented By: Richard F. Shordt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Michael P. Grace
Represented By: David Groff
Represented By: Richard F. Shordt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael P. Grace
Represented By: David Groff
Represented By: Richard F. Shordt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Donald B. Murphy Contractors
Represented By: Tymon Berger
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Represented By: John S. Riper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?