November 13, 2019 |
Filing
165
ORDER - Counsel will be provided with phone conference information via email. The law firm of Berger & Montague shall perform an accounting of the money distributed by the firm as part of this class action. Such accounting shall be provided to the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Counsel for the law firm of Berger & Montague is ordered to provide a copy of this Order to counsel for the defendant Craig Cohen. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees and costs (Filing No. 141 ) is granted. The plaintiffs, on behalf of the class, are awarded 30% of the Total Settlement Amount of $ ;4,000,000.00 ($1,200,000.00) in attorney fees. Plaintiffs Curtis Klug, Lawrence Nover, and Nels Roe, individually, are each awarded $5,000.00 as a service award. The plaintiffs, on behalf of the class, are awarded costs in the amount of $20,844.79. A Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
158
ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that: Farmers Insurance Exchange's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Filing No. 143 in Case No. 8:15cv61; Filing No. 149 in Case No. 8:16cv200) is denied as moot. Farmers Insurance Exchange's Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Filing No. 149 in Case No. 8:15cv61; Filing No. 155 in Case No. 8:16cv200) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
December 13, 2016 |
Filing
140
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: The Final Fairness Hearing originally scheduled for March 8, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., shall be continued until April 12, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. The court's Order granting preliminary approval in Klug v. Watts, No. 8:15cv6 1 (Filing No. 138) is modified as follows on page 10 at 24(b) and (c): b. All Requests to opt out of the Settlement must be received by the Claims Administrator within forty-five (45) days of the Notice Date ("Opt Out Deadline"). c. All Objections to the Settlement must be received by the Court within forty-five (45) days of the Notice Date ("Objection Deadline"). Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) Modified on 12/13/2016 to correct restriction(TCL).
|
December 7, 2016 |
Filing
138
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS; AND APPROVAL OF FORM AND CONTENT OF PROPOSED NOTICE. Fairness Hearing set for 3/8/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
121
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Farmers Insurance Exchange's Motion to Vacate Order Granting Watts' Motion to Strike is granted. The Court's June 30, 2016 Order granting Watts' Motion to Strike Confidential Declaration of Thomas J. Hackney is hereby stricken from the docket. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER granting (112) SEALED MOTION in case 8:15-cv-00061-JFB-FG3; granting (111) SEALED MOTION in case 8:16-cv-00200-JFB-FG3. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) Modified on 6/30/2016 to unseal(ADB, )
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CS)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing
28
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Watts Water Technologies, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Watts Regulator Company shall have until June 2 6, 2015, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff has the right to file a further amendment as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
|