Hernandez v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Josue Hernandez |
Defendant: |
Does 1 through 10, Federal National Mortgage Association and Green Tree Servicing, LLC |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00075 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Gerrard |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER - On or before August 22, 2016, the plaintiff shall show good cause for an extension of his deadline to respond to the defendants' motion for summary judgment. Absent such a showing, the Court may rule on the defendants' motion for summary judgment without further notice. ( Show Cause Deadline set for 8/22/2016). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER-Plaintiff and MERS shall confer and determine what, if any, documents Plaintiff is demanding that have not been produced. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Compel is denied without prejudice to reassertion, if necessary, after the parties have made a good-faith attempt to confer and resolve the discovery issues. Absent first conferring in good faith, any future motion to compel filed by Plaintiff will be summarily denied. As between Plaintiff and MERS, any motion to compel must be filed by July 27, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting the Unopposed 35 Motion to Continue as follows: a. the deadline for filing motions to compel is extended to May 31, 2016; and b. the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to June 28, 2016. On or before June 3, 2016 , Defendants shall serve on Plaintiff an affidavit or other statement signed under oath which: a. explains, transfer-by-transfer, how the note between Homecomings Financial, LLC and Plaintiff and dated December 20, 2006 ultimately became assig ned to Defendants; b. references, as to each transfer, the specific document or document page reflecting or evidencing the transfer; and c. affirms that all documents in Defendants' possession or control regarding Defendants' claim th at they are entitled to recover on the note have been produced and served on Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall: a. on or before June 3, 2016, fully respond to Defendants' written discovery; and b. on or before June 17, 2016, make himself availabl e to be deposed by Defendants in Nebraska. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to fully comply with the discovery process and this order, including but not limited to failing to cooperate with scheduling his deposition or failing to appear at his noticed deposition, may result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR) Modified on 5/17/2016 to reflect copy mailed to pro se party (MKR ).
|
March 10, 2016 |
Filing
32
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 31 Motion to Extend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until January 27, 2016 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is given until June 26, 2015 to show cause why the court should not dismiss for want of prosecution the claims brought by Plaintiff. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the claims filed by Plaintiff without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?