Chrisp v. Saunders County Jail et al
Plaintiff: |
Cameron Chrisp |
Defendant: |
Saunders County Jail and Saunders County, Nebraska |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00081 |
Filed: |
March 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Chrisp must file a second amended complaint within 30 days in accordance with this order. Failure to file a second amended complaint will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Chrisp. The clerk o f the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: June 22, 2015: Check for second amended complaint; dismiss if none filed. Chrisp's motion seeking the appointment of counsel (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days that sets forth only his claims against Saunders County Jail and Saunders County. Any claims not presented in the amended complaint will be deemed abandoned. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order, this case will be dismissed without further notice to him. The clerk's office is directed to send to Plaintiff a civil complaint form, which Plaintiff should use to assist h im in drafting his amended complaint. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: April 27, 2015: Check for amended complaint; dismiss if none filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with civil complaint form)(GJG)
|
March 4, 2015 |
Filing
1
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's claims against the Saunders County Jail and Saunders County, Nebraska, are severed into a new case. That new case shall be captioned: CAMERON CHRISP, Plaintiff, vs. SAUNDERS COUNTY JAIL, AND SAUNDERS COUNTY, NEBRASKA, Defendants. The new severed case shall be assigned to the undersigned judge for further proceedings. The clerk of the court is directed to file the following documents in the new case: this order; the original Complaint (Filing No. 1); Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No.8), which should be pending at the time the case is opened; and any other notices and general orders that are filed in pro se cases as a matter of course (e.g., the "NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint by a pro se party"). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?