Hasenbank v. State of Nebraska
Plaintiff: Heather Hasenbank
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2015cv00088
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that both parties must be included in all email and telephonic communications with the court. Telephonic conferences will not be scheduled absent a filed and pending motion. Plaintiff is advised that failing to comply with this order may result in dismissal of her case as a sanction for abusing court processes and for failing to comply with the court's orders. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Amend. To facilitate the orderly and timely disposition of this case, the deadline for moving to amend pleadings or add parties is 6/15/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - After conferring with the plaintiff and counsel for the defendant, deadlines set as stated herein.- If the case is not dismissed by summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity, within 10 days after the court's summary judgment ruling, Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant shall contact my chambers to further discuss case scheduling deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The court held a conference call with the parties today to determine the status of Plaintiff's ability to participate in this case. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, (Filing No. 26 ), shall be filed on or before March 3, 2016. Failure to file a timely response result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party as directed)(JAB)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this case may proceed to service of process against Ryan Martin in his individual capacity. Hasenbank's claims against the State of Nebraska, CPS, and Dale Weis are dismissed. The clerk is directed to send to Hasenban k a copy of the Complaint, a copy of this Memorandum and Order, and one summons form and one USM 285 form. If requested to do so in this matter, the US Marshal will serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Hasenbank. In making such a request, Hasenbank must complete the USM 285 form to be submitted to the clerk with the completed summons forms. The clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case for 12/14/15: check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed) (JSF)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff must file a third amended complaint within 30 days. The Plaintiff is ordered not to file any document aside from the one contemplated above without first obtaining leave of the court. The clerk of the court i s directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: June 17, 2015: check for amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a blank civil complaint form. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed) (JSF)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STRICKEN-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 279 ), filed by Plaintiff Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, is denied; The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 281 ), filed by Defendant Don Kleine, is denied; The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 283 ), filed by Defendant Todd Schmaderer is granted, in part, as follows: a. Phelps-Roper is precluded, in limine, from presenting any evidence of events of picketing or protest activities involving Phelps-Roper or the Westboro Baptist Church i n Nebraska prior to August 2011, as such evidence relates to Phelps-Ropers as applied challenge to the NFPL; b. The Motion is otherwise denied, without prejudice; and The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 285 ), filed by Defendant Todd Schmaderer, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR) Modified on 3/13/2015 to strike per Order 8 (MKR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasenbank v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hasenbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?