Kelley v. State of Nebraska et al
Petitioner: |
Kenneth E. Kelley |
Respondent: |
Michael Kenney, Diane Sabatka-Rhine and State of Nebraska |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00105 |
Filed: |
March 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Respondent's 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Kelley's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will enter judgment by separate order. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Kelleys Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 2 ) is denied without prejudice. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Atto rney General by regular first-class mail. By August 17, 2015, Respondents must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondents elect to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth in the order must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. If Respondents elect to file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. No later than 30 days after Petitioners brief is filed, Respondents must file and serve a reply brief. In the event that Respondents elect not to file a reply brief, they should inform the court by filing a notice stating that they will not file a reply brief and that the merits of the petition are theref ore fully submitted for decision. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/17/2015: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO 240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/4/2015:Check for MIFP or payment) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form AO 240)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?