Keup v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Keup
Defendant: Jane Does, John Does, Robert Lindemeier, Jeff Meyer and Matt Phillips
Case Number: 8:2015cv00113
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT - For the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order entered on this date, 30 Plaintiff's claims against the John and Jane Doe defendants are dismissed with prejudice. This case, as to any remaining defendants, if any, is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 18, 2016: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Within 30 days, Keup must file a response with the Court in which he shows cause for why his claims against the John and Jane Doe Defendants should not be dismissed as untimely under the applicable statute of limitations. Abse nt a showing of good cause, this case will be dismissed. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter: February 23, 2016: check for Keup's response. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Keup is given 30 days in which to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The amended complaint will supersede Keup's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ). Keup is encouraged to use the court approv ed form to draft his amended complaint, which the clerk of the court will provide to him. Keup must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is his "Amended Complaint" in this case. Keup's failure to file an amended co mplaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Keup. Keup's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 10 ) is denied without prejudice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Keup a blank civil complaint form. In addition, the clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: September 21, 2015: Check for amended complaint. To avoid confusion, any document Keup sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with complaint form)(GJG)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 3 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.80 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in respon se to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court.. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 8, 2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's cl aims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to Plaintiff's institution)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keup v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lindemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Keup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?