Akeredolu v. Eastern Nebraska Veterans Home et al
Plaintiff: Oluyinka I. Akeredolu
Defendant: Eastern Nebraska Veterans Home and Nebraska Health and Human Services
Case Number: 8:2015cv00130
Filed: April 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (filing 30 ) are adopted. The defendants' motions to dismiss (filing 21 ; filing 24 ) are granted. The plaintiff's claims against the moving defendants are dismissed. The plaintiff's claims against Bredberg are dismissed for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendants' motion to dismiss 7 is granted. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend her complaint, if any, on or before March 3, 2016. Failure to file a motion for leave to amend her complaint on or before March 3, 2016 may result in a final dismissal of the plaintiff's complaint without prejudice and without further notice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed with 2 summons and 285 forms)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akeredolu v. Eastern Nebraska Veterans Home et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oluyinka I. Akeredolu
Represented By: Vincent M. Ekeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Nebraska Veterans Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?