United States of America v. $32,780.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $32,780.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Raymond G Rivera
Case Number: 8:2015cv00131
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE - The Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Decree of Forfeiture (Filing No. 51 ) is granted. All right, title and interest in or to the Defendant currency held by any person or entity is h ereby forever barred and foreclosed. The Defendant currency shall be and the same hereby is forfeited to the United States of America. The Defendant currency shall be disposed of by the United States of America in accordance with law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that Raymond Rivera's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Dismiss Verified Claim (Filing No. 46 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the claimant's motion to suppress, Filing No. 14, is denied; The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation, Filing No. 32, is adopted in its entirety; and The objections of the claimant, Filing No. 34, are overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $32,780.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $32,780.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond G Rivera
Represented By: Michael D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Douglas J. Amen
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?