Purdie v. Gage
Petitioner: |
Keith Dawne Purdie |
Respondent: |
Brian Gage |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00155 |
Filed: |
April 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Purdie's 31 Motion and Request for Leave to Use the Original Record and 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice to reassertion in the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Purdie's "Motion for New Trial Hearing" (Filing No. 23 ) is denied; Purdie's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 26 ) is granted; and Purdie's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 27 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 13 ) is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice and the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By September 14, 2015, Respondent must f ile a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth in the order must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner; If Respondent elects t o file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner; ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/14/2015: deadline for Respondent to file state court re cords in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. ) ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for October 14, 2015: check for respondent's answer and separate brief.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot the Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee in this case on May 29, 2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?