Denoyer v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Dale Ernest DeNoyer
Respondent: U.S. Marshal's Service, U.S. Parole Commission, U.S. Probation Office and United States of America
Case Number: 8:2015cv00185
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order, 17 . Dale Denoyer's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Denoyer has 30 days in which to show cause why jurisdiction is proper in this federal district court. The court will dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice if DeNoer fails to respond to this order. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline: October 29, 2015: check for response to show cause order ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/29/2015:check for response to show cause order) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has 30 days in which to pay the $5.00 filing fee. He is warned that the court may dismiss this case without further notice to him if the fee is not paid. Plaintiff Dale Ernest DeNoyer shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 by July 6, 2015, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/6/2015: check for payment of filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denoyer v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Ernest DeNoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshal's Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?