Borovac v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paul Borovac
Defendant: Conexis Benefits Administrators, LP and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 8:2015cv00196
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting the plaintiffs' Unopposed 50 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff's claims against Conexis Benefits Administrators, LP are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - A settlement conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge's career law clerk (Bren Chambers), with Plaintiff and counsel and representatives of the defendants on 6/6/2016 at 1:00 PM in Court of Appeals Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(SLP)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - 1) The motion to withdraw filed by Justin W. High, as counsel of record for Plaintiff (filing no. 40 ), is granted. 2) On or before April 11, 2016, Plaintiff shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney fil e an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(JAB)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - Defendants' objection, (Filing No. 33 ), is denied. Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before February 26, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting motions to Strike 29 and 30 . Plaintiff's amended complaint, (Filing No. 28 ), is stricken. The deadlines for moving to amend pleadings or add parties are extended as follows: For the plaintiff: December 16, 2015.For the defendants: January 6, 2016.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify [her]self in any proceeding in which [her] impartiality might re asonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse herself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borovac v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Borovac
Represented By: Justin W. High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conexis Benefits Administrators, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?