Price v. Jarett et al
Plaintiff: Sean D. Price
Defendant: Brian Jarett and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00200
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 99 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees incurred herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SIXTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that the trial and pretrial conference scheduled in this matter are continued. A telephonic status conference will be held on September 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to set a new trial date and discuss case progression. Case conferencing instructions are found at (Filing No. 91 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions and any remaining written discovery shall be completed by May 31, 2017. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for October 2, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 S outh 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A four (4) day jury trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of October 16, 2017, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, Senior United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Kathleen Hughes and for Protective Order (Filing No. 59 ) is granted in part, and denied in part. Union Pacific shall produce, no later than April 28, 2017, the seven emails identified above. The email dated March 27, 2014 from Winkler to Hughes need not be produced. The parties are directed to submit a proposed amended progression order to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov no later than May 1, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: "May 1, 2017: Proposed Amended Progression Order Due." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel in Camera Review (Filing No. 61 ) is granted. Union Pacific shall produce the first eight emails listed on its privilege log (Filing No. 48 , Ex. A) to the Court under seal for in camera review. Union Pacific shall deliver the documents to the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge no later than April 10, 2017. The Court will rule on Union Pacific's Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition of Kathleen Hughes (Filing No. 59 ) following its review of the documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that the Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Progression Order Deadlines (Filing No. 56 ) is granted. The progression deadlines set in this case are stayed. The final pretrial conference and trial are continued and will be reschedul ed following a ruling on Defendants' anticipated motion for protective order. In the event Defendants do not file a motion for protective order by February 14, 2017, the parties shall submit a proposed amended progression order to Bazis@n ed.uscourts.gov. The clerk of court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: "February 14, 2017: Motion for Protective Order or Proposed Progression Order Due." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE AND RESCHEDULING OF TRIAL - The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines (Filing No. 41 ) is granted. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hrus ka Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska before the assigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE AND RESCHEDULING OF TRIAL granting 31 the parties' Motion to Extend Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2017 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2017 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CS, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE AND RESCHEDULING OF TRIAL - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines (Filing No. 28 ) is granted as set forth herein. Depositions due 8/15/16. Jury Trial set for 12/12/16 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/16 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 14 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SMN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Jarett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jarett
Represented By: Sara A. McCue
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Sara A. McCue
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean D. Price
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?