Ellis v. Foxall et al
Plaintiff: Hallord Ellis
Defendant: Alan Bogsby, Correct Care Solutions, Douglas County, Nebraska, Mary Earley, Dr. J. Esch and Mark Foxall
Case Number: 8:2015cv00214
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 17 ) is granted. Plaintiff's § 1983 claims asserted against the County Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's sta te law claims against the County Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Correct Care Solutions, Dr. J. Esch, and Alan Bogsby are dismissed without prejudice. The County Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 6 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. 9 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Defendants (Filing No. 11 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Filing No. 14 , a motion for extension of time, is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that in order for this case to proceed any further in this Court, Ellis must file the following two separate documents within 30 days: (a) a response to this order showing cause for why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution and for failure to serve process; and (b) an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted against Douglas County. Failure to file either document will result in the Court dismissing this case without prejudice and without further notice. The county defendants' motion for partial dismissal of the case is held in abeyance pending resolution of the issues discussed in this order. To avoid confusion, any document Ellis submits to the clerk of the court for filing must clearly display the case number. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following case management deadline: December 4, 2015: check for response and separate amended complaint.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Foxall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Bogsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Represented By: DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Earley
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Represented By: DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. J. Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Foxall
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Represented By: DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hallord Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?