Logsdon v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven C. Logsdon
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Andrew Callahan
Case Number: 8:2015cv00232
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting in part and denying in part BNSF's motion to exclude non-retained expert testimony 105 ; granting in part and denying in part BNSF's motion in limine 172 ; denying 174 BNSF's Motion in Limine regarding alleged FRSA retaliation; granting 175 BNSF's Motion in Limine regarding "disability determinations"; granting 184 BNSF's Motion in Limine regarding medical bills or expenses; granting in part and denying in part 191 Logsdon's Motion in Limine. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - BNSF's motion for summary judgment (filing 123 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as set forth above. Logsdon's claim under the FRSA is dismissed. BNSF's motion for leave to file supplemental authority (filing 142 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER - the defendant's objection (filing 158 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the plaintiff's objection to the Magistrate Judge's March 21, 2017 Order granting the defendant's motion for separate trials. After reviewing the record, the Court finds that the Magistrate Judge's Order was not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a); see 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Accordingly, the plaintiff's objection (filing 153 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying 148 BNSFs Motion for Amended Protective Order and Non-waiver of Privilege. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER - The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on August 28, 2017, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called , for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Confer ence is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on July 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in th e conference. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on July 11, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 133 Defendant's objection to Magistrate Judge Order and denying as moot 134 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 94 SEALED MOTION. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 99 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: As to the court's in camera review of Defendants' privilege log and associated documents, 94 , Defendants are given until July 19, 2016 to file affidavits (and any briefing they wish to file) in support of their claims of privilege, with Plaintiff given until August 2, 2016 to file any response. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of Count III of plaintiff's complaint 62 is granted. The claim in Count III of the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and fees with respect to that claim. Andrew Callahan's motion for summary judgment 56 is denied as moot. Andrew Callahan is terminated as a party to this case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding MOTION to Change Place of Trial 34 filed by Andrew Callahan, BNSF Railway Company. Defendants' motion to change the location of trial to Lincoln, Nebraska, (Filing No. 34), is granted, and this case is transferred to the Lincoln trial docket. Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before September 3, 2015, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Transfer Case. It is ORDERED this action be transferred to the District of Nebraska for further prosecution and adjudication. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/24/2015. (athom, )[Transferred from Colorado on 6/24/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logsdon v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Represented By: Tyler K. Spahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Callahan
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Logsdon
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Chod
Represented By: Donald F. D'Antuono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?