McMiller v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: |
Jazmyne McMiller |
Defendant: |
City of Omaha and Fred J. Hiykel |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00254 |
Filed: |
July 14, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1391 Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions to Extend 52 and 53 . The deadlines stated herein will govern the remainder of this case. 3-day Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Pla za, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB) Modified on 8/4/2017 to correct name of pretrial judge. (JAB)
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER that the defendant's motion to alter or amend (Filing No. 48 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
36
AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 in Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing
27
ORDER that plaintiff is considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendant may communicate with her directly. Counsel for the defendant shall initiate a conference with the plaintiff and, on or before October 8, 2016, file a status report proposing deadlines for final progression of this case to include proposed trial dates.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(CCB)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. 1. Martin A. Cannon's Motion to Withdraw (Filing No. 24 ) is granted. 2. The plaintiff shall have to on or before September 1, 2016, to retain substitute counsel. If substitute counsel has not entered an appearance by that date, the plaintiff will be considered proceeding pro se. 3. Moving counsel shall serve a copy of his motion and this order on the plaintiff and file a certificate of such service with the court, including the plaintiffs last known address. 4. All other deadlines are stayed pending resolution of this issue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
16
STRICKEN - MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that on the Court's own motion, Clayborne will be given 30 days in which to file an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in dismi ssal of this case without further notice to Clayborne. Clayborne's amended complaint will supersede Clayborne's original complaint and, therefore, the amended complaint must not incorporate any part of Clayborne's original complaint. Clayborne is encouraged to use the blank civil complaint form to draft his amended complaint, which the clerk of the court will provide to him. To avoid confusion, any amended complaint Clayborne sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this cas e must clearly display the case number and must reflect it is his amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: December 7, 2015: check for amended complaint; dismiss if none filed. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Clayborne a blank civil complaint form. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC) Modified on 11/6/2015 to add the word stricken per Order 16 (LAC).
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER that the parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on November 18, 2015, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?