Zhao et al v. Huang
Plaintiff: Zhong Ling Chen and Zemin Zhao
Defendant: Ji Feng Huang
Case Number: 8:2015cv00288
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 20 , is granted. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $199,133.47, plus post-judgment interest at the rate of 12% per annum. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB) Modified on 2/21/2017 to reflect copy mailed to pro se party.(JAB)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 20 , is construed as a motion for clerk's entry of default under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) and is referred to the Clerk of Court. In the event the Clerk of Court enters a default a gainst Defendant Ji Feng Huang: a. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order as well as the entry of default to the address listed below: Ji Feng Huang, 38-1 Nanfugong, Yunfeng RD, Baiyun District, Guiyang City Guiz hou, China 550014. b. Defendant Ji Feng Huang must respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, ECF No. 20 , within fourteen days after the Clerk of Court's entry of default; and c. The Clerk of Court is directed not to terminate the Motion that appears at ECF No. 20, but to set a response deadline of fourteen days from the date of the entry of default. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment 11 is denied. Plaintiff's Complaint as it relates to the October 2014 Loan is dismissed with leave to amend. The stay of progression in this case is lifted. The clerk of the court is directed to terminate the dismissal paper deadline set for June 15, 2015. The case will be progressed according to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding Stipulation 9 . Progression of this case is stayed until June 15, 2016, pending completion of the settlement payments or notification to the Court by the Parties that settlement was unsuccessful. On or before June 15, 2016, the Part ies will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and will submit to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a dismissal papers deadline of June 15, 2015. Absent compliance with this order, the stay will be lifted and this case will be progressed according to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhao et al v. Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhong Ling Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zemin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ji Feng Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?