COR Clearing, LLC v. Calissio Resources Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: COR Clearing, LLC
Defendant: Calissio Resources Group, Inc., Adam Carter, Signature Stock Transfer, Inc., Does 1-50, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc. and E-Trade Clearing, LLC
Interested Party: Benjamin Riley, Alicja Socha, Steven J Markow, John Link, Oscar Whitley, Randy Rosbough, Peter Suh, KCG Americas LLC, Alpine Securities Corporation, Casey Zimmerman, Elias Rodriguez, J. Curtis McCubbin, Scot Postlewait, Jeanny Yarborough, Robin Langmaid, John Harman, Charles Stritzinger, Arica Hossen, Ben Hossen, Ted Jorgensen, Tyler Hart, Scott Jeppe, Ryan Leininger, Belen Castillo, Jackie Rodriguez and Jaime Penarana
Case Number: 8:2015cv00317
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MANDATE from USCA - 8th Circuit (17-3556) In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 03/13/2019, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (LKO)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 JUDGMENT from USCA - 8th Circuit (17-3556) affirming the decision of the District Court regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #317 . This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (LKO)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 COPY of Opinion of USCA - 8th Circuit (17-3556) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #317 . (Attachments: #1 Letter to Publishing, #2 Counsel Opinion Letter) (LKO)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (17-3556) Appellant's motion to file a brief in excess of limits set forth in FRAP Rule 32(a)(A) and (B) is granted in part. Appellant may file a reply brief not to exceed 7,500 words. (KLF)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Transmittal Letter to USCA 8th Circuit[17-3556] regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA, #317 . Electronic copy of Transcripts #83 , #310 , and #311 sent. (JAB)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 SUPPLEMENT TO USCA RECORD (Hilgers, Michael)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit (17-3556) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA, #317 ; Transcript Designation set for 1/2/2018. (LAC)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Letter by Clerk USCA-8th Circuit (17-3556) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA, #317 . (LAC)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Order #313 and Judgment, #314 , Notice of Appeal to USCA, #317 . Notice of Appeal filed on 11/20/17 by Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES - FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. (LAC)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Order on Restricted Motion,,,,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion to Exclude,, #313 , Judgment, #314 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0867-3566312. (Hilgers, Michael)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order of dismissal entered this date, a judgment of dismissal without prejudice is entered with respect to defendant Adam Carter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER : This matter is before the court on its own motion. The record shows that defendant Adam Carter has never been served. See Filing No. 3, Summons. No return of summons has been filed. The action against defendant Carter is subject to dismissal without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (m). The court has been advised that the plaintiff has no objection to a dismissal without prejudice. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's claims against defendant Adam Carter are dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service. A judgment of dismissal will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 JUDGMENT pursuant to the Memorandum and Order #313 issued this date, a judgment of dismissal with prejudice is entered in favor of the defendants, Signature Stock Transfer, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., and E-Trade Clearing, LLC, and against the plaintiff, COR Clearing, LLC, with each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 237) is granted; Defendants National Financial Services, LLC's, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s, E-Trade Clearing, LLC's, and Scottrade, Inc.'s joint motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 255) is granted; Plaintiff COR Clearing Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (Filing No. 258) is denied; The parties' pending motions in limine (Filing No. 266 and Filing No. 270) are denied as moot; A judgment of dismissal will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 TEXT ORDER that on the court's own motion, the pretrial conference set for 11/6/17 at 10:00am is cancelled pending ruling on summary judgment motions and will be rescheduled by further order of the court. Any deadlines corresponding to the pretrial conference are held in abeyance. The jury trial remains set for 11/27/17. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Proceedings before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon held on October 23, 2017. Total Number of Billable Pages: 93. Pages: 1-93. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Susan M. DeVetter at (402) 661-7309 or suedevetter@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 11/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (SMD)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Proceedings before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon held on October 17, 2017. Total Number of Billable Pages: 106. Pages: 1-106. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Susan M. DeVetter at (402) 661-7309 or suedevetter@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 11/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (SMD)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2017 regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #266 , RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 , MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 . Argument by the parties. Motions taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. Courtroom Deputy: Amy Brunswick; Reporter: Sue DeVetter ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael T. Hilgers, Andrew R. Graben: Appearance for Defendants: William F. Hargens, Nicole K. Griffard, Michael G. Shannon, Gail E. Boliver, Ricardo M. DeBari and Robert R. Miller (by telephone). Time Start: 10:16 AM; Time Stop: 2:09 PM; Time in Court: 2 Hours 11 Minutes. (ADB)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2017 regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #255 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 . Hearing held in Omaha. Argument by the parties. Motions taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. Courtroom Deputy: Tiwauna Lawrence; Reporter: Sue DeVetter ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael T. Hilgers: Appearance for Defendants: William F. Hargens, Robert R. Miller, Brian J. Neville, Nicole K. Griffard, Michael G. Shannon (by telephone), Ricardo M. DeBari; Time Start: 1:39 PM; Time Stop: 3:57 PM; Time in Court: 2 Hours 6 Minutes. (TCL)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 AMENDED TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions. The unopposed oral request of the parties to reschedule the hearing is granted. The MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 , RESTRICTED MOTION for Summary Judgment #237 , and RESTRICTED Daubert MOTION #266 are rescheduled for 10/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on RESTRICTED MOTION #237 : Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 , RESTRICTED MOTION #255 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 , RESTRICTED MOTION #266 : Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity Global Brokerage Group, Inc. for National Financial Services LLC. by Attorney Michael G. Shannon on behalf of Defendants National Financial Services LLC, Fidelity Global Brokerage Group, Inc..(Shannon, Michael)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 TEXT ORDER granting #298 Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Filing Nos. 299, 300, and 301 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 TEXT ORDER granting #295 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 296 and 297 shall be restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Index of Evidence in support of its Reply Brief regarding MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Reply Brief in support of its regarding MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Reply Opposition in Support of its regarding MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Preclude the Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Adam Bryan ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defedants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Clearing Firm Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 TEXT ORDER granting #293 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs. Reply briefs pertaining to the pending motions for summary judgment #255 #258 and motions to preclude reports and testimony of expert witnesses #266 #270 shall be filed by September 19, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR REPLIES TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLIES TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE THE EPORT AND TESTIMONY OF PROFERRED EXPERTS by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 TEXT ORDER granting #286 Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 287, 288, 289, and 290 shall be restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 TEXT ORDER granting #282 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 283, 284, and 285 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR's Index of Evidence to its Opposition to Clearing Firm Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR's Opposition to Clearing Firm Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #255 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR's Index of Evidence in Support of its Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Preclude Testimony and Report ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Testimony and Report regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #266 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Nicole K. Griffard, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - Part 1, #4 Exhibit B - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit 2 - Delcaration of Paul C. Carroll)(Hargens, William)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Opposition regarding MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Opposition regarding MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TEXT ORDER granting #280 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Briefs opposing the motions for summary judgment #255 #258 and motions to preclude reports and testimony of expert witnesses #266 #270 shall be filed by September 7, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Briefing Deadline for Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and Oppositions to Motions to Preclude the Report and Testimony of Proffered Experts by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 TEXT ORDER granting #276 Unopposed Motion to Amend. Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc. is hereby granted leave to supplement its index of evidence #239 offered in support of its motion for summary judgment with the Declaration of Gail E. Boliver. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 35A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 38 - Declaration of Gail E. Boliver)(Boliver, Gail)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 for Summary Judgment by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 TEXT ORDER granting #269 Motion to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 271 and 272 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 TEXT ORDER granting #265 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 267 and 268 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 TEXT ORDER granting #264 Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Defendant shall file its reply brief in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment #237 by August 25, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence in Support of its regarding MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Hilgers, Michael)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Brief in Support of its regarding MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll #270 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION to Exclude (Daubert) Testimony of Paul Carroll by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defendants' Index of Evicence in Support of Motion #266 to Preclude the Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Adam Bryan ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Declaration of Michael G. Shannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Griffard, Nicole)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion #266 to Preclude the Report and Testimony of Plaintiff's Proferred Expert Adam Bryan and Request for Oral Argument ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Griffard, Nicole)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESTRICTED MOTION Clearing Firm Defendants' Motion to Preclude the Report and Testimony of Adam Bryan ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Griffard, Nicole) Modified on 8/22/2017 to change event type to a motion (ADB).
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Clearing Firm Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Griffard, Nicole)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TEXT ORDER granting #254 Unopposed Motion to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 255, 256, and 261 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 TEXT ORDER granting #257 Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filing Nos. 259 and 260 shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defendants' Index of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #255 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Hargens, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V)(Hargens, William)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Index of Evidence In Support of Its regarding MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Hilgers, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT COR Clearing's Brief In Support of Its regarding MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #258 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearing Firm Defendants' Brief In Support of Joing Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument regarding UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Clearing Firm Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access #254 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Clearning Firm Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument regarding UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Clearing Firm Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access #254 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William) Modified on 8/16/2017 to correct event type(TCL).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Clearing Firm Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 TEXT ORDER granting #252 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Daubert Motions. The deadline for filing Daubert motions is extended to August 21, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Deadline for Filing Daubert Motions by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 TEXT ORDER granting #248 Motion For Leave to File Documents as Restricted Access. Access to Filings Nos. 249 and 250 and shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence in Opposition to Signature Stock's Motion for Summary Judgment regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Hilgers, Michael)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Brief in Opposition to Signature Stock's Motion for Summary Judgment regarding RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TEXT ORDER granting #246 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment #237 by August 4, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to RESTRICTED MOTION - #237 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 TEXT ORDER granting #243 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Discovery shall be completed by August 14, 2017. Daubert motions and motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than August 14, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Certificate of Service of Supplemental Response to Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Michael G. Shannon on behalf of Defendant National Financial Services LLC.(Shannon, Michael)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend COURT'S ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DAUBERT MOTIONS AND THE FOURTH AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 TEXT ORDER granting #236 Motion to Restrict Access to Documents. Access to Filing Nos. 237, 238, and 239 herein shall remain restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Certificate of Service of Defendant Scottrade, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendant Scottrade, Inc..(Hargens, William)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.. (Boliver, Gail)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Evidence ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 Exhibit 1E, #6 Exhibit 1F, #7 Exhibit 2A, #8 Exhibit 2B, #9 Exhibit 2C, #10 Exhibit 2D, #11 Exhibit 2E, #12 Exhibit 2F, #13 Exhibit 2G, #14 Exhibit 3A, #15 Exhibit 3B, #16 Exhibit 3C, #17 Exhibit 3D, #18 Exhibit 3E, #19 Exhibit 3F, #20 Exhibit 4A, #21 Exhibit 4B, #22 Exhibit 4C, #23 Exhibit 4D, #24 Exhibit 4E, #25 Exhibit 4F, #26 Exhibit 4G, #27 Exhibit 5A, #28 Exhibit 5B, #29 Exhibit 5C, #30 Exhibit 5D, #31 Exhibit 5E, #32 Exhibit 5F, #33 Exhibit 5G, #34 Exhibit 6A, #35 Exhibit 6B, #36 Exhibit 6C, #37 Exhibit 6D, #38 Exhibit 6E, #39 Exhibit 6F, #40 Exhibit 6G, #41 Exhibit 7A, #42 Exhibit 7B, #43 Exhibit 7C, #44 Exhibit 7D, #45 Exhibit 7E, #46 Exhibit 7F, #47 Exhibit 8A, #48 Exhibit 8B, #49 Exhibit 8C, #50 Exhibit 8D, #51 Exhibit 8E, #52 Exhibit 8F, #53 Exhibit 9A, #54 Exhibit 9B, #55 Exhibit 9C, #56 Exhibit 9D, #57 Exhibit 9E, #58 Exhibit 9F, #59 Exhibit 9G, #60 Exhibit 10A, #61 Exhibit 10B, #62 Exhibit 10C, #63 Exhibit 10D, #64 Exhibit 10E, #65 Exhibit 10F, #66 Exhibit 11A, #67 Exhibit 11B, #68 Exhibit 11C, #69 Exhibit 11D, #70 Exhibit 11E, #71 Exhibit 11F, #72 Exhibit 11G, #73 Exhibit 12A, #74 Exhibit 12B, #75 Exhibit 12C, #76 Exhibit 12D, #77 Exhibit 12E, #78 Exhibit 12F, #79 Exhibit 13A, #80 Exhibit 13B, #81 Exhibit 13C, #82 Exhibit 13D, #83 Exhibit 13E, #84 Exhibit 13F, #85 Exhibit 13G, #86 Exhibit 13H, #87 Exhibit 13I, #88 Exhibit 13J, #89 Exhibit 13K, #90 Exhibit 13L, #91 Exhibit 14A, #92 Exhibit 14B, #93 Exhibit 14C, #94 Exhibit 14D, #95 Exhibit 14E, #96 Exhibit 14F, #97 Exhibit 14G, #98 Exhibit 15A, #99 Exhibit 15B, #100 Exhibit 15C, #101 Exhibit 15D, #102 Exhibit 15E, #103 Exhibit 15F, #104 Exhibit 15G, #105 Exhibit 15H, #106 Exhibit 15I, #107 Exhibit 15J, #108 Exhibit 15K, #109 Exhibit 15L, #110 Exhibit 15M, #111 Exhibit 15N, #112 Exhibit 15O, #113 Exhibit 16A, #114 Exhibit 16B, #115 Exhibit 16C, #116 Exhibit 16D, #117 Exhibit 16E, #118 Exhibit 16F, #119 Exhibit 16G, #120 Exhibit 16H, #121 Exhibit 16I, #122 Exhibit 16J, #123 Exhibit 16K, #124 Exhibit 16L, #125 Exhibit 17, #126 Exhibit 18, #127 Exhibit 19, #128 Exhibit 20, #129 Exhibit 21, #130 Exhibit 22, #131 Exhibit 23, #132 Exhibit 24, #133 Exhibit 25, #134 Exhibit 26, #135 Exhibit 27, #136 Exhibit 28, #137 Exhibit 29, #138 Exhibit 30)(Boliver, Gail)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 RESTRICTED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail) Modified on 7/10/2017 to change event type to a motion(ADB).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TEXT ORDER that the deadline for filing a motion challenging the qualifications of an expert or the admissibility of testimony of an expert witness under Rule 702, Fed. Rules of Evidence in Paragraph 6 of the Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case #234 is extended to July 31, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - This matter is before the court on its own motion. This Fourth Final Progression Order reflects the extensions granted in the court's previous orders and continues the dates for the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial in the interest of justice. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Jury Trial set for 11/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Certificate of Service of Expert Report by Attorney Michael G. Shannon on behalf of Defendant National Financial Services LLC.(Shannon, Michael)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TEXT ORDER SETTING PHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 6/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom no longer assigned to the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #199 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as stated herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lori-Ann Trezza by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. (Hargens, William)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that defendant, Signature Stock Transfer Inc.'s motion to compel production of documents is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER that the motion is granted; the discovery deadline is extended to July 30, 2017. The deadline for the filing of motions for summary judgment is extended to July 30, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Copy mailed to pro se party (LAC) Modified on 5/31/2017 to include copies mailed to pro se (LAC).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Third Amended Progression Order by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Certificate of Service - Second Set of Interrogatories to COR Clearing, LLC by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #219 TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. and Scottrade, Inc.'s Motion to Amend. - 1) The deadline for defendants to submit expert reports is extended to June 16, 2017. 2) The deadline to disclose additional expert witnesses if necessary to refute disclosed opinions of opponent's expert witnesses is extended to June 30, 2017. 3) The deadline for motions challenging the qualifications of an expert or the admissibility of testimony of an expert witness is extended to July 17, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Certificate of Service of COR's Second Supplemental Responses to NFS's Interrogatories and First Supplemental Responses to NFS's RFP by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Certificate of Service of COR's First Supplemental Responses to TDAC's RFP (First Set) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Certificate of Service of COR's Responses to Signature Stock's Interrogatories (First Set) and Requests for Production (Second Set) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Third Amended Progression Order by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Griffard, Nicole)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Certificate of Serving COR's Supplemental Responses to NFSs Interrogatories (First Set) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Certificate of Serving COR's Responses to E-Trade's Requests for Production of Documents (First Set) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 INDEX in support of Brief, #215 in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Declaration of Robert R. Miller, #2 Exhibit -- Declaration of Jonathan Bruckner, #3 Exhibit -- Declaration of Joanne Padarathsing, #4 Exhibit -- Declaration of Kelly Zigaitis, #5 Exhibit -- Declaration of Chad Johnson)(Reilly, Matthew)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Reilly, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER that the motion to strike is granted; Filing No. #209 is stricken. The amended motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel is granted. Moving defendants shall have until May 3, 2017, to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel. Plaintiff shall have until May 15, 2017, to file its reply. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #194 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilgers, Michael)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #194 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Culhane, Thomas)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Strike UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 #209 by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Culhane, Thomas)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STRICKEN - UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Culhane, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2017 to add the word stricken per Order #214 (LAC).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER that the motion is granted. Elizabeth B. Smith, formerly of the law firm of McGrath North Mullin Kratz, PC LLO, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., and Scottrade, Inc. The clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Elizabeth B. Smith by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. (Griffard, Nicole)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER - that the motion #202 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until May 1, 2017, to file its brief in response to Signature Stock's motion to compel #194 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Certificate of Serving COR's Expert Disclosures with Report and Curriculum Vitae by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Certificate of Serving COR's Responses to NFS's Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (First Set) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend COR's Time to Respond to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #194 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Hilgers, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses #199 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Certificate of Service - Second Request for Production of Documents to COR Clearing, LLC by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Certificate of Service - First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, COR Clearing, LLC by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER that the motion (Filing No. 195) is granted. a) Plaintiff shall have until April 14, 2017, to disclose expert witnesses, with full reports. b) Defendants shall have until May 17, 2017, to disclose expert witnesses, with full reports. c) The parties shall have until June 7, 2017, to disclose rebuttal expert witnesses. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines Order on Motion to Extend,, #193 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Boliver, Gail)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - granting #191 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 14, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. before the assigned magistrate judge, in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence at 9:00 a.m. on September 5, 2017, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Riccardo M. DeBari for Defendant National Financial Services LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case,, #136 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Certificate OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, SCOTTRADE, INC.'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, COR CLEARING, LLC (FIRST SET) by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendant Scottrade, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Certificate OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, TD AMERITRADE CLEARING, INC.'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, COR CLEARING, LLC (FIRST SET) by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to Amend Protective Order #90 by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #175 by E-Trade Clearing, LLC (Culhane, Thomas)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that the motion is granted. Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC, shall have until February 15, 2017, to answer or file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's second amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #175 by Scottrade, Inc. (Smith, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #175 by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. (Smith, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (to Second Amended Complaint, Doc. #175) by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Reilly, Matthew)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #175 by National Financial Services LLC (Shannon, Michael)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert R. Miller on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Miller, Robert)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Certificate OF SERVICE by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendant Scottrade, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Certificate OF SERVICE by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Certificate OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (FIRST SET) by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendant Scottrade, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SUPPLEMENT regarding Amended Complaint #175 Exhibits A - C by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand (Second Amended Complaint) against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of COR Clearing, LLC(Hilgers, Michael)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER - that plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint #171 is granted. Plaintiff shall file its second amended complaint on or before February 10, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert R. Miller on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Miller, Robert)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert R. Miller on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Miller, Robert)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilgers, Michael)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing regarding Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case #136 . Jury Trial set for 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CCB)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Following Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken's retirement on December 31, 2016, all pending civil and criminal cases previously assigned to Magistrate Thalken are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken no longer assigned to the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CCB)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER that the motions are granted. Defendants National Financial Services, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., and Scottrade, Inc., and E-Trade Clearing shall have until January 20, 2017, to answer or file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's first amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC (Reilly, Matthew)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Culhane, Thomas)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Andrew R. Graben on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC (Graben, Andrew)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jackson W. Rudd on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC (Rudd, Jackson)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Certificate of Service of Second Set of Requests for Production on Defendants by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant National Financial Services LLC.(Davidson, Steven)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clearing Firm Defendants' joint motion to dismiss is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sur-reply is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Leave by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilgers, Michael)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert R. Miller has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brian J. Neville has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Robert R. Miller for Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Brian J. Neville for Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Certificate of Service of Requests for Production on Defendants by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Certificate of Service of Interrogatories on Defendants by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance Mary Ann Novak, Andrew Graben, Jackson Rudd, and Michael Hilgers by Attorney Mary Ann Novak on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC (Novak, Mary Ann)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) #137 by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 INDEX in support of Brief #149 in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hilgers, Michael)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 BRIEF in opposition to JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) #137 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that the motion (filing #147 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 21, 2016, to file its response to defendants' motion to dismiss. Clearing Firm defendants shall have until November 11, 2016, to file their reply brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Filing Response and Reply Briefs to Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Scottrade Financial Services, Inc. for Scottrade, Inc.. by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., Scottrade Financial Services, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent TD Ameritrade Online Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation for TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Online Holdings Corporation, TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation.(Smith, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Certificate of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Certificate of Service of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s and Scottrade, Inc.'s Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant National Financial Services LLC (Davidson, Steven)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER - that the motion #140 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 17, 2017, to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline for Response to Defendants' JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) #137 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 INDEX in support of JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) #137 Clearing Firm Defendants' Index of Evidence in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 123) by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven D. Davidson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Steven D. Davidson)(Hargens, William)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) #137 Clearning Firm Defendants' Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 123) by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (filing No. 123) by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - The defendants' NFS, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Scottrade Inc., and E-Trade Clearing, LLC shall have until September 16, 2016, to file an Answer with respect to the Amended Complaint #123 . Depositions due May 30, 2017. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before the assigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JLS, )
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER - that the motion is granted. E-Trade Clearing, LLC, shall have until September 9, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Thomas J. Culhane on behalf of Defendant E-Trade Clearing, LLC.(Culhane, Thomas)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael G. Shannon has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Michael G. Shannon for Defendant National Financial Services LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER that the motion is granted. National Financial Services, LLC, shall have until September 9, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant National Financial Services LLC.(Davidson, Steven)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Summons Issued as to defendants E-Trade Clearing, LLC, National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint, #123 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JAB)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Summons Requested as to TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc regarding Amended Complaint, #123 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Summons Requested as to Scottrade Inc regarding Amended Complaint, #123 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Summons Requested as to National Financial Services LLC regarding Amended Complaint, #123 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Summons Requested as to E*TRADE CLEARING LLC regarding Amended Complaint, #123 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., National Financial Services LLC, Scottrade, Inc., E-Trade Clearing, LLC, by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of COR Clearing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hilgers, Michael)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #121 Motion for Leave to amend complaint. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint on or before August 15,2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed)(MKR)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilgers, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that the stipulation (Filing No. #119 ) is approved. TDAC shall have until July 20, 2016, to comply with COR Clearing, LLC's motion to compel. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JOINT STIPULATION regarding Order on Motion to Compel, #116 AND FILING NO. 94 by Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Smith, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - The stipulation #117 is approved and adopted and the motion is granted. The parties shall have until August 1, 2016, to amend pleadings and add parties to this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case,, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #113 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents and things in response to the December 4, 2015, subpoena #94 is granted. TDAC shall comply with plaintiff's motion to compel on or before June 10, 2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TEXT ORDER granting #114 and #24 , each Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel construed as motions. For good cause shown pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(f), David L. Aronoff and Saul S. Rostamian of Winston & Strawn LLP are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff. Other counsel remains for the plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall stop all electronic notices to withdrawing counsel regarding this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorneys by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC (Hilgers, Michael) Modified on 5/19/2016 to reflect this is a motion and not a notice. (CCB).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER on the parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines #112 . Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom., Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Order Setting Schedule for Final Progression of a Civil Case, #93 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) #94 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JUDGMENT that plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Calissio (Filing No. #108 ) is granted as set forth in Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 E-Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Andrew G. Smith. E-mail was not resent. Attorney Andrew G. Smith is no longer employed with law firm. Attorney David Aronoff from the same law firm, Winston Strawn Law Firm, represents plaintiff. This was confirmed by Office Manager Michelle Ward. Notice is forthcoming. Attorney Andrew G. Smith is termed. (CCB)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Default Judgment and Declaration of Michael Hilgers Application For Default Judgment and Affidavit In Support by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hilgers)(Hilgers, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2016 to correct incorrect event type(MKR).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Restrict. Exhibit A (Filing No. #106 ) shall be filed as restricted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Declaration of William F. Hargens regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Document as Restricted Access #105 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Document as Restricted Access by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 INDEX in support of Brief #103 in Opposition to Cor Clearing, LLC's Motion to Compel by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Chad Johnsen, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of William Hargens)(Hargens, William)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) #94 by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that the motion (Filing No. #101 ) is granted ; TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., shall have until April 19, 2016, to oppose or otherwise respond to COR Clearing's motion to compel. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend TD AMERITRADE, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) #94 by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that plaintiff's motion is granted. Its brief in support of its motion to compel and Exhibit B (Filing No. #98 ) shall be filed as restricted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Elizabeth Bruening Smith has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Exhibit B and Unredacted Brief in Support of Motion to Compel regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File as Restricted Access Documents Exhibit B and Unredacted Brief in Support of Motion to Compel #97 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Hilgers, Michael)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File as Restricted Access Documents Exhibit B and Unredacted Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) #94 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C)(Hilgers, Michael)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) #94 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel [Redacted] by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Third Party Subpoena (TD Ameritrade) by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER- Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2016 at 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Protective Order Governing Discovery by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint by Signature Stock Transfer, Inc. (Boliver, Gail)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that that the motion is granted; the parties shall have until January 31, 2016, to file their Rule 26(f)(2) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #29 motion to dismiss under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6) and Rule 9(b). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadline for Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Motion to Appoint Receiver proceeding before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom held on November 10, 2015. Pages 1 through 76. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. - ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 12/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2016. (BLF)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 INDEX in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #29 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Hilgers, Michael)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #29 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #20 motion to appoint receiver; denying objection as moot #26 ; denying objection as moot #32 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 WITNESS LIST from Motion Hearing held on November 10, 2015.(TCL )
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2015 regarding MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 . Hearing held in Omaha. Argument by parties. Matter is submitted. Written order forthcoming. Courtroom Deputy: Tiwauna Lawrence; Reporter: Brenda Fauber; Appearance for Plaintiff and Interested Party Alpine Securities Corporation: Michael T. Hilgers; Appearance for Defendant: None Present; Appearance for Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.: William F. Hargen; Time Start: 8:59 AM; Time Stop: 10:44 AM; Time in Court: 1 Hour 45 Minutes. (TCL ) Modified on 11/10/2015 to add text(TCL ).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Email on behalf of Interested Party Jaime Penarana. (LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Email on behalf of Interested Party Jackie Rodriguez. (LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Email on behalf of Interested Party Casey Zimmerman. (LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUPPLEMENT regarding Reply #51 Supplement to Reply and Exhibits 1, A by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A)(Hilgers, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Email on behalf of Interested Party Belen Castillo. (LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Email on behalf of Interested Party Ryan Leininger. (LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Email on behalf of Interested Party Scott Jeppe. (LAC)
November 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Email on behalf of Interested Party Jeanny Yarborough. (LAC)
November 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Email on behalf of Interested Party Steven J Markow (LAC)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Email on behalf of Interested Party Tyler Hart. (LAC)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Email on behalf of Interested Party Ted Jorgensen. (LAC)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Email on behalf of Interested Parties Arica Hossen and Ben Hossen. (LAC)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that a hearing on expedited motion for order appointing limited purpose receiver (Filing No. #20 ) is scheduled for: Tuesday, November 10, 2015, at 9 a.m., Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Email on behalf of Interested Party Charles Stritzinger. (LAC)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Email on behalf of Interested Party John Harman. (LAC)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Email on behalf of Interested Party Robin Langmaid. (LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Email on behalf of Interested Party Jeanny Yarborough. (LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Email on behalf of Interested Party Scot Postlewait. (LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Email on behalf of Interested Party J. Curtis McCubbin. (LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUPPLEMENT regarding Reply #51 , Index #52 Supplemental Certificate of Service for COR Clearing's Reply and Index by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Certificate regarding Order,,, #28 Certificate of Compliance with Court's October 20, 2015 Order by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Email on behalf of Interested Party Steven J Markow. (LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Email on behalf of Interested Party Casey Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 email)(LAC)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Email on behalf of Interested Party Casey Zimmerman (LAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2015: #1 Confirmation email, #2 Confirmation email, #3 Casey Zimmerman email) (LAC, ). Modified on 11/4/2015 to include attachments (LAC).
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Email on behalf of Interested Party Casey Zimmerman. (LAC)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INDEX in support of Reply #51 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A)(Hilgers, Michael)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY regarding MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 Omnibus Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Appoint Receiver by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that the motion of Alpine Securities Corporation (Filing No. #45 ) is granted. Exhibits E, G, and H in support of its memorandum of law may be filed as restricted, pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett no longer assigned to the case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Email on behalf of Interested Party Elias Rodriguez. (LAC)
October 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Email on behalf of Interested Party Casey Zimmerman. (LAC)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Restricted Access Documents Exhibits E, G, and H regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File as Restricted Access Exhibits E, G, and H #45 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Interested Party Alpine Securities Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H)(Hilgers, Michael)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File as Restricted Access Exhibits E, G, and H by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Interested Party Alpine Securities Corporation.(Hilgers, Michael)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 INDEX in support of Response, #43 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Interested Party Alpine Securities Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit 2)(Hilgers, Michael)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE regarding Order,,, #28 Alpine Securities Corporation's Response in Support of Plaintiff COR Clearing's Motion for Order Appointing Limited Purpose Receiver by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Interested Party Alpine Securities Corporation.(Hilgers, Michael)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s Index of Evidence in Support of Its Opposition to COR Clearning, LLC's Motion for Order Appointing Limited Purpose Receiver by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad Johnsen, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chad Johnsen)(Hargens, William)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 TD Ameritrade Clearning, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to COR Clearing, LLC's Motion for Order Appointing Limited Purpose Receiver by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Email on behalf of Interested Party Steven J Markow. (LAC)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Benjamin Riley's expedited motion fore leave to file amicus brief is denied. Riley's motion and brief will be construed as an objection to plaintiff's motion and considered by the Court in its ruling on plaintiff's motion to appoint a limited receiver. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the stipulation #37 is approved and adopted. TD Ameritrade shall have until October 30, 2015, to respond to plaintiff's motion for order appointing limited purpose receiver. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT STIPULATION regarding MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 Regarding TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.'s Response to Cor Clearing, LLC's Motion for Order Appointing Limited Purpose Receiver by Attorney William F. Hargens, Elizabeth Bruening Smith on behalf of Interested Party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc..(Hargens, William)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE on behalf of Interested Party KCG Americas LLC. (LAC)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Email of on behalf of Interested Party Peter Suh. (LAC)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Email regarding Motion to Appoint Receiver #20 on on behalf of Interested Party Randy Rosbough. (LAC)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion to Appoint Receiver #20 on behalf of Interested Party Oscar Whitley. (LAC)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OBJECTION to Motion to Appoint Receiver #20 on behalf of Interested Party John Link.(TCL )
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying as moot #16 motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading as defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc., has filed a motion to dismiss #29 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #29 by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Gail E. Boliver on behalf of Defendant Signature Stock Transfer, Inc..(Boliver, Gail)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that before the Court rules on plaintiff's motion (Filing No. #20 ): 1) COR Clearing shall give notice of the motion, supporting memoranda, and the proposed order to every DTCC member firm credited and/or debited with dividends and/or interim accounting allocations for shares of Calissio Resources Group,Inc. from June 1 to August 30, 2015. 2) The notice will be by overnight mail/Federal Express within one day of this Order to the addresses that were provided by DTCC to COR Clearing on October 4, 2015, pursuant to subpoena. 3) All affected parties shall have seven days from the date of receipt of this notice to file a response to COR Clearings motion, if they so desire. 4) COR Clearing shall have seven days to reply to any responses. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OBJECTION to Motion to Appoint Receiver #20 on behalf of Interested Party Alicja Socha.(LAC)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION (Expedited) for Leave to File Amicus Brief on behalf of Interested Party Benjamin Riley.(LAC)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Attorney Andrew G. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC (Smith, Andrew) Modified on 5/19/2016 to reflect motion rather than notice (CCB).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Email of on behalf of Interested Party Steven J Markow (LAC)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Certificate regarding Index,,, #22 , MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 , Brief #21 Service on Defendant Signature Stock Transfer by Attorney Andrew G. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INDEX in support of MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 by Attorney Andrew G. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David L. Aronoff, #2 Exhibit A - DTC Distributions Service Guide, #3 Exhibit B - 6/1/15 Calissio Press Release, #4 Exhibit C - 8/24/15 Calissio Press Release, #5 Exhibit D - 8/13/15 Calissio Press Release, #6 Exhibit G - 8/28/15 e-mail chain, #7 Exhibit I - Calissio Profile, #8 Exhibit J - Greenspan CV, #9 Affidavit of Leonard Hirschhorn, #10 Affidavit of Thomas Pikor, #11 Affidavit of Carlos Salas, #12 Exhibit E - 8/25/15 Carter e-mail to Darbie, #13 Exhibit F - 8/25/15 Carter e-mail to Salas, #14 Exhibit H - 8/28/15 e-mails)(Smith, Andrew)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Appoint Receiver #20 by Attorney Andrew G. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Attorney Andrew G. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Smith, Andrew)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Calissio Resources Group, Inc. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed to defendant)(LAC)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INDEX in support of MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against CALISSIO RESOURCES GROUP, INC. #17 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against CALISSIO RESOURCES GROUP, INC. by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Stock Transfer to Complaint by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC.(Hilgers, Michael)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Signature Stock Transfer, Inc defendant COR Clearing, LLC on 8/28/2015. (Hilgers, Michael)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Andrew G. Smith for Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Saul S. Rostamian for Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney David L. Aronoff for Plaintiff COR Clearing, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
August 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Calissio Resources Group, Inc. on 8/27/2015. (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant Calissio Resources Group, Inc., Adam Carter and Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Saul S. Rostamian has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew G. Smith has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David L. Aronoff has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom and Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett assigned. (LAC)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Signature Stock Transfer, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Calissio Resources Group regarding Complaint, #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Adam Carter regarding Complaint, #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent COR Securities Holdings, Inc. for COR Clearing, LLC. by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiffs COR Clearing, LLC, COR Securities Holdings, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3022289), by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of COR Clearing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hilgers, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COR Clearing, LLC v. Calissio Resources Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COR Clearing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew R. Graben
Represented By: Andrew G. Smith
Represented By: Carrie S. Dolton
Represented By: David L. Aronoff
Represented By: Jackson W. Rudd
Represented By: Mary Ann Novak
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Saul S. Rostamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calissio Resources Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Stock Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Gail E. Boliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bruening Smith
Represented By: Nicole K. Griffard
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Shannon
Represented By: Riccardo M. DeBari
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottrade, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bruening Smith
Represented By: Nicole K. Griffard
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Trade Clearing, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Neville
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Represented By: Robert R. Miller
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Benjamin Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alicja Socha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Steven J Markow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oscar Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Randy Rosbough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Peter Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KCG Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alpine Securities Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Casey Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Elias Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: J. Curtis McCubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scot Postlewait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeanny Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robin Langmaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Charles Stritzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arica Hossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ben Hossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ted Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyler Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Jeppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ryan Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Belen Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jackie Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jaime Penarana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?